Carlberg et al v. Guam Industrial Services dba Guam Shipyard et al

Plaintiff: Russ Carlberg, Roel D. Dacasin, Reynaldo S. Galvez, Delmario R. Cortez and Gary Chang
Defendant: Guam Industrial Services dba Guam Shipyard and Mathew Pothen
Case Number: 1:2014cv00002
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: Guam District Court
Office: Hagatna Office
County: Guam
Presiding Judge: Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood
Referring Judge: Joaquin V.E. Manibusan
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:2101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2017 220 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying Plaintiffs' 162 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Defendants' 172 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Defendants' 166 Motion to Strike Jury Demand Pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 39(a)(2). Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 9/30/2017. (fad, )
March 7, 2017 183 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 126 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 3/7/2017. (fad, )
December 30, 2016 153 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 101 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' gross negligence and negligence per se claims. Plaintiffs were at-will employees, and Defendants owed them no duty of care in terminating their employment under Guam law. Addit ionally, Plaintiffs' negligence per se claim is improper because it seeks to impermissibly use the WARN Act to recover common-law remedies in circumvention of Congress's intent. Finally, Plaintiffs' claim for punitive damages is STRICKEN because their negligence claims have been dismissed, and the WARN Act does not permit punitive damages. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 12/30/2016. (fad, )
March 25, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 16 Motion to Dismiss; denying 35 Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1); granting Plaintiffs leave to amend the Complaint in accordance with this order. The Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than fourteen days from the date of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 3/25/2016. (fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlberg et al v. Guam Industrial Services dba Guam Shipyard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russ Carlberg
Represented By: Joshua D. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roel D. Dacasin
Represented By: Joshua D. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo S. Galvez
Represented By: Joshua D. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delmario R. Cortez
Represented By: Joshua D. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Chang
Represented By: Joshua D. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guam Industrial Services dba Guam Shipyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Pothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?