Jacot et al v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Ty J. Jacot and S.E.T. Pacific, Inc.
Defendant: Jay D. Miller, Rita S. Miller and John Does I-III
Case Number: 1:2016cv00074
Filed: September 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Office: Hagatna Office
County: Guam
Presiding Judge: Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood
Presiding Judge: Joaquin V.E. Manibusan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Order denying 117 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 8/9/2019. (fad, )
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order re Defendants' 98 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' motion for summary judgment against Ty J. Jacot is DENIED. 2. Defendants' motion for summary judgment against S.E.T. Pacific, Inc. is GRANTED. 3. S.E.T. Pacific, Inc. is hereby DISMISSED from this lawsuit. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 5/22/2019. (fad, )
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order denying 8 Motion to Dismiss The Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 9/28/2017. (fad, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacot et al v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ty J. Jacot
Represented By: Louie J. Yanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E.T. Pacific, Inc.
Represented By: Louie J. Yanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay D. Miller
Represented By: Norman E. Greenspan
Represented By: Joseph C. Razzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita S. Miller
Represented By: Norman E. Greenspan
Represented By: Joseph C. Razzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-III
Represented By: Joseph C. Razzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?