Guam Contractors Association et al v. Lynch et al

Plaintiff: Guam Contractors Association, Ace Builders, LLC, BME & Son's, Inc., Guam Tropical Dive Station, Inc., Guam XRay, Johndel International, Inc., Inland Builders Corporation, Landscape Management Systems, Inc., Marianas Linen Supply, Inc., Phil-Gets (Guam) International Trading Corporation, Zenaida M. Zantua and 5M Construction Corporation
Defendant: Loretta E. Lynch, Jeh Johnson, Leon Rodriguez, Donald Neufeld and Kathy Baran
Case Number: 1:2016cv00075
Filed: October 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Office: Hagatna Office
County: Guam
Presiding Judge: Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood
Presiding Judge: Joaquin V.E. Manibusan
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Order granting 110 Motion to Hold Summary Judgment in Abeyance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 7/19/2019. (fad, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Order denying 109 Motion to Compel Additional Discovery without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 7/15/2019. (fad, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Report And Recommendations re 108 Motion Contempt. The Court hereby recommends that the District Court find that Defendants have failed to comply with the Court's PI Order of January 24, 2018.... Defendants have failed to meaningfully apprec iate the implications, ramifications, and reach of the Court's PI Order which enjoined them from using its prior denial reasoning with respect to current petitions and the Court's mandate to adjudicate future petitions in accord with long standing practice. Plaintiffs are entitled to appropriate sanctions. Objections to R&R due by 7/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 6/25/2019. (fad, )
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion for Clarification; granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion for More Definite Statement. The court ORDERS that: (1) For any earlier submitted petition for which Plaintiffs seek reconsi deration, Plaintiffs shall seek updated temporary labor certification from GDOL and, if granted, shall submit the certification to USCIS to be considered in conjunction with the corresponding petition. New labor certifications may be issued for the s ame period of time originally requested or whatever other period GDOL may deem appropriate. (2) For any new petition Plaintiffs may submit to USCIS for adjudication for any prospective period of need, Plaintiffs must submit along with the petition a new temporary labor certification from GDOL corresponding to the period of need. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 2/8/2018. (fad, )
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order Re Motion to Dismiss; Objections to Report and Recommendation. The Defendants' 30 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs' Claims 4, 5, 6 and 7 are DISMISSED. The Plaintiffs' 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED in part. The Magistrate Judge's 61 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in part and MODIFIED in part. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 1/24/2018. (fad, )
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Report And Recommendations re 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Based on the above analysis, although some Plaintiffs have shown that they are likely to suffer irreparable harm in the absence of a preliminary injunction, and that the balance of equities and the public interest appears to tip in favor of the Plaintiffs, the court finds that the Plaintiffs have failed to demonstrate that they are likely to succeed on the merits of their claims. Because mandatory injunctions are generally disfavored and because the standard of review is highly deferential under the APA, the below-signed judge recommends that the Chief Judge deny the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Objections to R&R due by 8/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 8/11/2017. (fad, )
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order granting 10 Motion to Hold in Abeyance Plaintiffs' 7 Motion to Certify a Class. Since a decision on the merits may render all class certification issues moot, the court further finds that it is in the interests of justice and judicial economy to stay the class certification issue until Defendants' motion to dismiss and any other dispositive motions are resolved. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 7/25/2017. (fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guam Contractors Association et al v. Lynch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guam Contractors Association
Represented By: Jennifer C. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ace Builders, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer C. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BME & Son's, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer C. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guam Tropical Dive Station, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer C. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guam XRay
Represented By: Jennifer C. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johndel International, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer C. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inland Builders Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer C. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landscape Management Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer C. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianas Linen Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer C. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil-Gets (Guam) International Trading Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer C. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenaida M. Zantua
Represented By: Jennifer C. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5M Construction Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer C. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta E. Lynch
Represented By: Vinita B. Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Glenn Matthew Girdharry
Represented By: Heather Sokolower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh Johnson
Represented By: Vinita B. Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Glenn Matthew Girdharry
Represented By: Heather Sokolower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Rodriguez
Represented By: Vinita B. Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Glenn Matthew Girdharry
Represented By: Heather Sokolower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Represented By: Vinita B. Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Glenn Matthew Girdharry
Represented By: Heather Sokolower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Baran
Represented By: Vinita B. Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Glenn Matthew Girdharry
Represented By: Heather Sokolower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?