A.J.A. v. Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana et al
Plaintiff: A.J.A.
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea, Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana, Doe-Individuals 6-50, Capuchin Franciscans, DOE Entities 1-5, Capuchins Franciscans Province of St. Mary and Capuchin Franciscans Province of St. Mary
Case Number: 1:2018cv00027
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Office: Hagatna Office
County: Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood and Superior Court Judge Michael J. Bordallo. Joint Status Conference held on 8/14/2018. Next Joint Status Conference set for 9/11/2018 08:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom District Court of Guam.(Court Reporter Veronica Flores.)(Start Time: 8:42, End Time: 9:29.) (fad, )
July 26, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure of Plaintiff's Name and Place of Residence filed by A.J.A. (fad, ) (fad, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Deficiency. Document due: Plaintiff's Disclosure of Name and Place of Residence. Document due by 3:00 p.m. Friday, July 27, 2018.(fad, )
July 24, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed filed by A.J.A.. Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (fad, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Entry of Appearance filed by John Coulter Terlaje on behalf of Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana (Terlaje, John)
July 19, 2018 Summons Issued as to Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana. (vtk)
July 19, 2018 Summons Issued as to Capuchins Franciscans Province of St. Mary. (vtk)
July 19, 2018 Summons Issued as to Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea. (vtk)
July 19, 2018 Summons Issued as to Capuchin Franciscans. (vtk)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge. (vtk)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number GUX014545.), filed by A.J.A. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (vtk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.J.A. v. Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.J.A.
Represented By: David J. Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana
Represented By: John Coulter Terlaje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe-Individuals 6-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchins Franciscans Province of St. Mary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans Province of St. Mary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?