National Labor Relations Board v. Pacific Waste Systems, LLC

Plaintiff: National Labor Relations Board
Defendant: Pacific Waste Systems, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00029
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Office: Hagatna Office
County: Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:160(1) National Labor Relations Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Service filed by National Labor Relations Board re #9 First Motion to Withdraw Application for Order Requiring Obedience to Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Beerman, Jeff). (Beerman, Jeff)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 First Motion to Withdraw Application for Order Requiring Obedience to Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Beerman, Jeff)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting #6 Motion to Continue. Show Cause Hearing continued to 10/16/2018 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 9/13/2018. (fad, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Service filed by National Labor Relations Board re #6 First Motion to Continue. filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Beerman, Jeff). (Beerman, Jeff)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 First Motion to Continue. filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Beerman, Jeff)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Service filed by National Labor Relations Board re #4 First Motion to Appear By Telephone . filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Beerman, Jeff). (Beerman, Jeff)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 First Motion to Appear By Telephone . filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Beerman, Jeff)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Service filed by National Labor Relations Board. Certificate of Service of Order to Show Cause.Application.Related Documents filed by National Labor Relations Board (Beerman, Jeff)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order To Show Cause. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/18/2018 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr. Respondent shall file its Answer to Applicant's Application within 21 days of service hereof. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 8/15/2018. (fad, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against Pacific Waste Systems, LLC filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authority, #2 Declaration of Attorney Beerman, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I, #12 Certificate of Service, #13 Cover Sheet Form JS 44 Cover Sheet)(Beerman, Jeff) **Modified on 8/7/2018 to edit docket text** (vtk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Labor Relations Board v. Pacific Waste Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: Jeff F. Beerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Waste Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?