Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc. v. United States Department of Air Force

Plaintiff: Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc.
Defendant: United States Department of Air Force
Case Number: 1:2018cv00030
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Office: Hagatna Office
County: Guam
0 Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
1 Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 11/6/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2018 at 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, )
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer United States Department of Air Force answer due 10/9/2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 9/28/2018. (fad, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Cover Sheet,, Counterclaim, filed by United States Department of Air Force. (Wessling, Jessica)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 First Corporate Disclosure filed by Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc. FRCP Rule 7.1. (Cook, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2018 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Air Force. (fad, )
August 8, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number GUX014600 re #1 Cover Sheet,, Counterclaim, (fad, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of Deficiency: FRCP Rule 7.1. Disclosure Statement Due. (fad, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint for Disclosure of Information Pursuant to Freedom of Information Act against United States Department of Air Force filed by Axe Murder Tours Guam, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Cook, Jeffrey) **Modified on 8/8/2018 to correct event type and edit docket text** (fad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc. v. United States Department of Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Air Force
Represented By: Jessica F. Wessling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?