Smith et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Hope Julia Lopez and Mxsas Smith
Defendant: Rebecca F. Maliuwelur, Shaun Harris and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv00032
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Court Certificate of Service re #3 Clerk's Notice of Letter - Mxsas Smith served on 10/17/2018 via first class mail postage prepaid at 178 Francisco Javier Ave., Apt. 316, Agana Heights, GU 96910 (fad, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of Letter (fad, )
September 17, 2018 Court Certificate of Service re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Mxsas Smith, Hope Julia Lopez.(fad, ) - USAO acknowledged receipt on 9/17/2018. (fad, )
September 17, 2018 Court Certificate of Service re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Mxsas Smith, Hope Julia Lopez - Office of the General Counsel, U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 9/17/2018 via certified mail no. 7015 1660 0000 0187 6165 at 245 Murray Lane SW, Mail Stop 0485, Washington DC 20528-0485, Rebecca F. Maliuwelur served on 9/17/2018 via certified mail no. 7015 1660 0000 0187 6172 at 770 East Sunset Blvd., Suite 185, Barrigada, Guam 96913, Attorney General of the United States served on 9/17/2018 via certified mail no. 7015 1660 0000 0187 6158 at 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington DC 20530-0001. (fad, )
September 13, 2018 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number GUX014698 re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (fad, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Mxsas Smith, Hope Julia Lopez.(fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca F. Maliuwelur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Julia Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mxsas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?