Lau v. Fernandez et al

Plaintiff: Gabriel H.T. Lau
Defendant: Jon Fernandez, Guam Department of Education for the Government of Guam, Antonette Santos and Guam Department of Education for Government of Guam
Case Number: 1:2018cv00034
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
0 Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
1 Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:791
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Court Certificate of Service re #11 Clerk's Notice of Receipt of Letter (fad, ) - Gabriel H.T. Lau served on 11/19/2018 via first class mail at Pacific Tower B-107, 177B Mall Street, Tamuning, Guam 96913; Jesse J.N. Nasis served on 11/19/2018 via first class mail at 500 Mariner Avenue, Barrigada, Guam 96913. (hpg, )
November 18, 2018 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice of Receipt of Letter (fad, )
November 14, 2018 Court Certificate of Service re #10 Scheduling Notice - Gabriel H.T. Lau served on 11/14/2018 via first class mail at Pacific Tower B-107, 177B Mall Street, Tamuning, Guam 96913; Jesse J.N. Nasis served on 11/14/2018 via first class mail at 500 Mariner Avenue, Barrigada, Guam 96913. (fad, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 12/20/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, ) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/14/2018) (fad, ). **Modified on 11/14/2018 to attach corrected pdf** (fad, ).
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice of Receipt of Letter (fad, )
October 19, 2018 Court Certificate of Service re #8 Clerk's Notice of Receipt of Letter - Gabriel H.T. Lau served via first class mail, postage prepaid, on 10/19/2018 at Pacific Tower B107, 177B Mall Street, Tamuning, Guam 96911; Jesse Nasis served via first class mail, postage prepaid, on 10/19/2018 at Guam Department of Education, 500 Mariner Avenue, Barrigada, Guam 96913 (fad, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Receipt of Letter (fad, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2018: #1 Unredacted Attachment) (fad, ).
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jon Fernandez, Guam Department of Education for Government of Guam, Antonette Santos.(fad, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed filed by Gabriel H.T. Lau. Jon Fernandez served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (fad, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed filed by Gabriel H.T. Lau. Antonette Santos served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (fad, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed filed by Gabriel H.T. Lau. Guam Department of Education for the Government of Guam served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (fad, )
September 24, 2018 Summons Issued as to Jon Fernandez, Guam Department of Education for the Government of Guam, Antonette Santos. (fad, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit filed by Gabriel H.T. Lau. (fad, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants filed by Gabriel H.T. Lau. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 10/31/2018.(fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lau v. Fernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Fernandez
Represented By: Jesse J.N. Nasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guam Department of Education for the Government of Guam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonette Santos
Represented By: Jesse J.N. Nasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guam Department of Education for Government of Guam
Represented By: Jesse J.N. Nasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel H.T. Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?