Washington D.C. Seattle City et al v. Navy Federal Credit Union et al

Plaintiff: Manufacturing Inc., Washington D.C. Seattle City, Jaydeen Catherine Dela Cruz and Washington D.C., Seattle City Manufacturing Inc.
Defendant: Community First Credit Union, PENFED Federal Credit Union, Navy Federal Credit Union and Coast 360 Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2018cv00037
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 Third Amended Complaint against All Defendants., filed by Jaydeen Catherine Dela Cruz.(fad, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (vtk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (vtk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Amended Complaint against All Defendants., filed by Washington D.C. Seattle City, Jaydeen Catherine Dela Cruz, Manufacturing Inc..(fad, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit filed by All Plaintiffs. (fad, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington D.C. Seattle City et al v. Navy Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community First Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENFED Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast 360 Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manufacturing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington D.C. Seattle City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaydeen Catherine Dela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington D.C., Seattle City Manufacturing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?