Terlaje v. Government Of Guam

Plaintiff: Pedro M. Terlaje
Defendant: Ciara L.S. Finona, Does I Through XX, Antonio B. Won Pat International Airport Authority, Guam, Guam Police Department, Department of Corrections, Pan Sa Kim, Charles H. Ada, II, Alberto A. Lamorena, Government Of Guam, Joseph Cruz and Does I Through X
Case Number: 1:2018cv00042
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
0 Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
1 Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 First Amended Complaint Kim, Ciara, GIAA and Does I thru X against, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Terlaje, Jacqueline)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 2/7/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order finding as moot #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Charles H. Ada, II answer due 2/4/2019; Antonio B. Won Pat International Airport Authority, Guam answer due 2/4/2019; Ciara L.S. Finona answer due 2/4/2019; Pan Sa Kim answer due 2/4/2019.; granting #7 Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond. GIAA's time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint extended to 2/4/2019. Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss due 1/11/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 12/26/2018. (fad, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, #5 Motion to Dismiss by Charles H. Ada, II, Antonio B. Won Pat International Airport Authority, Guam, Ciara L.S. Finona, Pan Sa Kim. (Rapadas, Genevieve)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Charles H. Ada, II, Antonio B. Won Pat International Airport Authority, Guam, Ciara L.S. Finona, Pan Sa Kim. (Rapadas, Genevieve)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Government Of Guam. (Highsmith, David)
November 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to Attorney General of Guam, Government Of Guam. (vtk)
November 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to Ciara L.S. Finona. (vtk)
November 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to Pan Sa Kim. (vtk)
November 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to Alberto A. Lamorena V. (vtk)
November 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to Charles H. Ada, II. (vtk)
November 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to Joseph Cruz. (vtk)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Cover SheetForm JS-44, filed by Pedro M. Terlaje.(Terlaje, Jacqueline)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice of Deficiency: Civil Cover Sheet, Form JS-44 due immediately.(fad, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0993-454960.), filed by Pedro M Terlaje. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 12/24/2018.(Terlaje, Jacqueline) Modified on 11/14/2018 to correct docket text(cbw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terlaje v. Government Of Guam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciara L.S. Finona
Represented By: Genevieve P. Rapadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I Through XX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio B. Won Pat International Airport Authority, Guam
Represented By: Genevieve P. Rapadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guam Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan Sa Kim
Represented By: Genevieve P. Rapadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles H. Ada, II
Represented By: Genevieve P. Rapadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto A. Lamorena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Of Guam
Represented By: David J. Highsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I Through X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro M. Terlaje
Represented By: Jacqueline Taitano Terlaje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?