United States for the Use and Benefit of Tereas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States for the Use and Benefit of Tereas, Inc.
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company and Pernix Guam, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00043
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 Entry of Appearance filed by Deborah E. Fisher on behalf of Pernix Guam, LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company (Huesman, Braddock) Modified on 1/9/2019 (fad, ).
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 Notice filed by Pernix Guam, LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company Corporate Disclosure Statement (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Huesman, Braddock)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Complaint filed by Pernix Guam, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support John T. Wilson, #2 Exhibit A Part 1, #3 Exhibit A Part 2, #4 Exhibit A Part 3, #5 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Huesman, Braddock) **Modified on 1/10/2019 to edit docket text** (fad, ).
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Huesman, Braddock)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure filed by United States for the Use and Benefit of Tereas, Inc. . (Yanza, Louie)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Deficiency: FRCP Rule 7.1. Disclosure Statement Due from Plaintiff (fad, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed filed by United States for the Use and Benefit of Tereas, Inc.. Zurich American Insurance Company served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Yanza, Louie)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed filed by United States for the Use and Benefit of Tereas, Inc.. Pernix Guam, LLC served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (fad, )
November 29, 2018 Summons Issued as to Zurich American Insurance Company. (vtk)
November 29, 2018 Summons Issued as to Pernix Guam, LLC. (vtk)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge. (vtk)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number GUX014897.), filed by United States for the Use and Benefit of Tereas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(vtk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States for the Use and Benefit of Tereas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Deborah E. Fisher
Represented By: Braddock J. Huesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pernix Guam, LLC
Represented By: Deborah E. Fisher
Represented By: Braddock J. Huesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States for the Use and Benefit of Tereas, Inc.
Represented By: Louie J. Yanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?