Philips v. Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Sherif A. Philips
Defendant: Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc., David Creech, Paul Bolin, Jay Salsman and Ralph Whatley
Case Number: 1:2018cv00046
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's #19 "First Memorandum of Law"; Certificate of Service. by Paul Bolin, David Creech, Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc., Jay Salsman, Ralph Whatley. (Berman, Daniel) **Modified on 2/20/2019 to edit docket text** (fad, ).
February 7, 2019 Filing 20 Reply to Response re #17 Response,,, ; Certificate of Service filed by Paul Bolin, David Creech, Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc., Jay Salsman, Ralph Whatley. (Berman, Daniel)
January 30, 2019 Filing 19 First Memorandum of Law filed by Sherif A. Philips (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A). (vtk)
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Paul Bolin, David Creech, Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc., Jay Salsman, Ralph Whatley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berman, Daniel)
January 24, 2019 Filing 17 Response filed by Sherif A. Philips re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(1), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2), Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D, #5 Attachment F, #6 Attachment G, #7 Attachment H, #8 Attachment I, #9 Attachment J, #10 Attachment K, #11 Attachment M, #12 Attachment N, #13 Attachment L, #14 Attachment O, #15 Attachment P, #16 Attachment Q, #17 Attachment R, #18 Attachment S, #19 Attachment T, #20 Attachment RR, #21 Attachment W, #22 Attachment HH, #23 Attachment Z, #24 Attachment EE)(fad, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Service (re #15 Declaration, #10 Memorandum in Support,, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(1), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2), Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Under Rule 12(b)(6), #12 Declaration, #14 Declaration, #13 Declaration, #11 Declaration, ) by Paul Bolin, David Creech, Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc., Jay Salsman, Ralph Whatley. (Berman, Daniel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 Declaration of Jay Salsman re #10 Memorandum in Support,, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(1), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2), Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Under Rule 12(b)(6) . (Berman, Daniel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 Declaration of David Creech re #10 Memorandum in Support,, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(1), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2), Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Under Rule 12(b)(6) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berman, Daniel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Ralph E. Whatley re #10 Memorandum in Support,, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(1), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2), Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Under Rule 12(b)(6) . (Berman, Daniel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 Declaration of Paul Bolin re #10 Memorandum in Support,, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(1), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2), Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Under Rule 12(b)(6) . (Berman, Daniel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 Declaration of Brian Floyd on behalf of Defendant Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc. re #10 Memorandum in Support,, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(1), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2), Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Under Rule 12(b)(6) . (Berman, Daniel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re: #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(1), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2), Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Paul Bolin, David Creech, Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc., Jay Salsman, Ralph Whatley. (Berman, Daniel) . filed by Paul Bolin, David Creech, Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc., Jay Salsman, Ralph Whatley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Berman, Daniel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(1), Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2), Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Paul Bolin, David Creech, Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc., Jay Salsman, Ralph Whatley. (Berman, Daniel)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 Response to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice filed by Sherif A. Philips (fad, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of Appearance filed by Daniel James Berman on behalf of Paul Bolin, David Creech, Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc., Jay Salsman, Ralph Whatley (Berman, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed filed by Sherif A. Philips. Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc. served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (fad, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed filed by Sherif A. Philips. David Creech served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (fad, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed filed by Sherif A. Philips. Paul Bolin served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (fad, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed filed by Sherif A. Philips. Ralph Whatley served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (fad, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Returned Executed filed by Sherif A. Philips. Jay Salsman served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (fad, )
December 27, 2018 Summons Issued as to Paul Bolin, David Creech, Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc., Jay Salsman, Ralph Whatley. (fad, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number GUX014982.), filed by Sherif A. Philips.(fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philips v. Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pitt County Memorial Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel James Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Creech
Represented By: Daniel James Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Bolin
Represented By: Daniel James Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Salsman
Represented By: Daniel James Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Whatley
Represented By: Daniel James Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Sherif A. Philips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?