United States of America v. 2008 BLACK MERCEDES BENZ G55, VIN NO. WDCYR71E58X175031, GUAM LICENSE PLATE NO. MG2342 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $9,016 IN U.S. CURRENCY, LADY'S PLATINUM RING WITH ONE ROUND BRILLIANT CUT DIAMOND 2.95 CARATS (ESTIMATED), 2013 YELLOW SUZUKI HAYABUSA GSX1300RAZL3, VIN NO. JS1GX72B3D2100292, 2015 SILVER LEXUS LX570, VIN NO. JTJHY7AX9F4179413, GUAM LICENSE PLATE NO. SR2865, $1,801 IN U.S. CURRENCY, $22,510.60 IN U.S. CURRENCY SEIZED FROM COAST 360 FEDERAL CREDIT UNION BANK VALUE CHECKING ACCOUNT FOR ACCOUNTING NO. ENDING IN LAST FOUR DIGITS 4764, HELD IN THE NAMES OF RAYMOND J. MARTINEZ AND and 2008 BLACK MERCEDES BENZ G55, VIN NO. WDCYR71E58X175031, GUAM LICENSE PLATE NO. MG2342
Claimant: Raymond John Martinez and Juanita Marie Quitugua Moser
Case Number: 1:2019cv00002
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; denying #13 Motion to Seal. Claim due by 4/4/2019. Answer due 21 days after filing of the claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 3/5/2019. (fad, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Extension of Time for Raymond Martinez to File Claim and Answer filed by United States of America (fad, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to Seal filed by United States of America. (fad, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Civil Forfeiture Action filed by All Defendants. (Perez, Peter)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. If a timely claim is filed, then Ms. Moser shall file an answer no later than 21 days after filing the claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 3/5/2019. (fad, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Claim. Claim due by 4/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 3/5/2019. (fad, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Claim filed by $1,801 IN U.S. CURRENCY, $22,510.60 IN U.S. CURRENCY SEIZED FROM COAST 360 FEDERAL CREDIT UNION BANK VALUE CHECKING ACCOUNT FOR ACCOUNTING NO. ENDING IN LAST FOUR DIGITS 4764, HELD IN THE NAMES OF RAYMOND J. MARTINEZ AND, $9,016 IN U.S. CURRENCY, 2008 BLACK MERCEDES BENZ G55, VIN NO. WDCYR71E58X175031, GUAM LICENSE PLATE NO. MG2342, 2013 YELLOW SUZUKI HAYABUSA GSX1300RAZL3, VIN NO. JS1GX72B3D2100292, 2015 SILVER LEXUS LX570, VIN NO. JTJHY7AX9F4179413, GUAM LICENSE PLATE NO. SR2865, LADY'S PLATINUM RING WITH ONE ROUND BRILLIANT CUT DIAMOND 2.95 CARATS (ESTIMATED). (Lujan, David)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by $1,801 IN U.S. CURRENCY, $22,510.60 IN U.S. CURRENCY SEIZED FROM COAST 360 FEDERAL CREDIT UNION BANK VALUE CHECKING ACCOUNT FOR ACCOUNTING NO. ENDING IN LAST FOUR DIGITS 4764, HELD IN THE NAMES OF RAYMOND J. MARTINEZ AND, $9,016 IN U.S. CURRENCY, 2008 BLACK MERCEDES BENZ G55, VIN NO. WDCYR71E58X175031, GUAM LICENSE PLATE NO. MG2342, 2013 YELLOW SUZUKI HAYABUSA GSX1300RAZL3, VIN NO. JS1GX72B3D2100292, 2015 SILVER LEXUS LX570, VIN NO. JTJHY7AX9F4179413, GUAM LICENSE PLATE NO. SR2865, LADY'S PLATINUM RING WITH ONE ROUND BRILLIANT CUT DIAMOND 2.95 CARATS (ESTIMATED). (Lujan, David)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 Warrant Returned Executed. (fad, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Service (re Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint ) by United States of America. (Schwab, Mikel)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of Appearance filed by Jessica F. Wessling on behalf of United States of America (Wessling, Jessica)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Notice re #1 Complaint (Schwab, Mikel)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
January 28, 2019 Court Certificate of Service re Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued (fad, ) - USAO acknowledged receipt on 1/28/2019. (fad, )
January 28, 2019 Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued (fad, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwab, Mikel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem (Verified) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Schwab, Mikel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2008 BLACK MERCEDES BENZ G55, VIN NO. WDCYR71E58X175031, GUAM LICENSE PLATE NO. MG2342 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $9,016 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LADY'S PLATINUM RING WITH ONE ROUND BRILLIANT CUT DIAMOND 2.95 CARATS (ESTIMATED)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2013 YELLOW SUZUKI HAYABUSA GSX1300RAZL3, VIN NO. JS1GX72B3D2100292
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 SILVER LEXUS LX570, VIN NO. JTJHY7AX9F4179413, GUAM LICENSE PLATE NO. SR2865
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,801 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $22,510.60 IN U.S. CURRENCY SEIZED FROM COAST 360 FEDERAL CREDIT UNION BANK VALUE CHECKING ACCOUNT FOR ACCOUNTING NO. ENDING IN LAST FOUR DIGITS 4764, HELD IN THE NAMES OF RAYMOND J. MARTINEZ AND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2008 BLACK MERCEDES BENZ G55, VIN NO. WDCYR71E58X175031, GUAM LICENSE PLATE NO. MG2342
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mikel W. Schwab
Represented By: Jessica F. Wessling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Raymond John Martinez
Represented By: Peter Cornell Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Juanita Marie Quitugua Moser
Represented By: David J. Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?