Linsangan v. Government Of Guam et al
Plaintiff: Sedfrey M. Linsangan
Defendant: Lourdes Leon Guerrero and Government Of Guam
Case Number: 1:2019cv00011
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 48:1424
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 Scheduling and Planning Report. (fad, )
June 5, 2019 Court Certificate of Service re #15 Scheduling Notice - Sedfrey M. Linsangan served on 06/05/2019 via first class mail, postage prepaid, at P.O. Box 23128, Barrigada, Guam 96921 (fad, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 7/16/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 10:15 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 Reply to Response re #7 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sedfrey M. Linsangan. (fad, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Mailing . (Taitano, Shannon)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 Opposition re #7 Motion for Summary Judgment Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Taitano, Shannon)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Hearing (related documents #7 Motion for Summary Judgment ). filed by Sedfrey M. Linsangan. (fad, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Service filed by Government Of Guam, Lourdes Leon Guerrero re #9 Entry of Appearance filed by Marianne Woloschuk on behalf of All Defendants (Woloschuk, Marianne). Declaration of Mailing (Woloschuk, Marianne)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of Appearance filed by Marianne Woloschuk on behalf of All Defendants (Woloschuk, Marianne)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re: #7 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sedfrey M. Linsangan. (fad, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sedfrey M. Linsangan. (fad, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Service filed by Government Of Guam re #5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Government Of Guam.(Taitano, Shannon). Declaration of Mailing (Taitano, Shannon)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Government Of Guam.(Taitano, Shannon)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Service Re Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge filed by Government Of Guam. (fad, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed filed by Sedfrey M. Linsangan. Government Of Guam served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019; Lourdes Leon Guerrero served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (fad, )
April 4, 2019 Summons Issued as to Lourdes Leon Guerrero. (fad, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number GUX015266.), filed by Sedfrey M. Linsangan.(fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linsangan v. Government Of Guam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lourdes Leon Guerrero
Represented By: Marianne Woloschuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Of Guam
Represented By: Shannon Joy Taitano
Represented By: Marianne Woloschuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedfrey M. Linsangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?