J.R. v. Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana et al
Plaintiff: J.R.
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District, Boy Scouts of America, Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea, DOE Entities 1-5, Capuchin Franciscans, DOE Individuals 6-50, inclusive, Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana and Capuchin Franciscans, Province of St. Mary
Case Number: 1:2019cv00095
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Writ of Certiorari. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 5/22/2019. (fad, )
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order. Counsel for parties to advise the court via email whether they are interested in availing themselves of the services of the circuit mediators, at no cost. Responses due no later than 5/14/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 5/10/2019. (vtk)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order. Stay extended to 7/1/2019 for non-bankruptcy parties. Requests to complete service of process on the unserved defendants during this interim period granted. The court grants the various Plaintiffs' requests to file amended complaints to the extent that such amendment would not violate the automatic stay imposed in the bankruptcy proceeding. The court sets this matter for a continued status hearing on June 27, 2019, at 8:30 a.m. Any counsel not previously admitted to the bar of this court shall file the appropriate admission application sufficiently in advance of the next status hearing or risk not being permitted to participate in the next status hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 4/25/2019. (fad, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 4/25/2019. Joint Status Conference before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood and Superior Court Judge Michael J. Bordallo. Stay extended until July 1, 2019. Court to provide list of possible settlement judges by 5/3/2019. Continued Status hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Veronica Flores.) (fad, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana from Superior Court of Guam, case number CV0433-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0993-472556), filed by Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Case)(Terlaje, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.R. v. Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District
Represented By: G. Patrick Civille (non-CJA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: G. Patrick Civille (non-CJA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans
Represented By: Vincent Cristobal Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Individuals 6-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana
Represented By: John Coulter Terlaje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans, Province of St. Mary
Represented By: Vincent Cristobal Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R.
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?