Quidachay v. Director, Department of Revenue and Taxation
Plaintiff: Ronnie Camacho Quidachay
Defendant: Director, Department of Revenue and Taxation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00103
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 48:1424
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Director, Department of Revenue and Taxation.(May, Monty)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 9/10/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, )
June 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to Director, Department of Revenue and Taxation. (hpg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (hpg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number filed by Ronnie Camacho Quidachay. (hpg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 Petition in a Tax case ( Filing fee $ 60.00 receipt number GUX015457.), filed by Ronnie Camacho Quidachay.(hpg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quidachay v. Director, Department of Revenue and Taxation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Department of Revenue and Taxation
Represented By: Monty Rex May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Camacho Quidachay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?