Jacob et al vs. Plastics Engineering Company (PLENCO)
Plaintiff: Eusebio V. Jacob and Marta A. Jacob
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc. and Plastics Engineering Company (PLENCO)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00108
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure filed by Plastics Engineering Company (PLENCO) . (Fowler, Kevin)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Plastics Engineering Company (PLENCO). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fowler, Kevin)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 9/10/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed Plastics Engineering Company (PLENCO) served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Berman, Daniel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed Rockwell Automation, Inc. served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Berman, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to Plastics Engineering Company (PLENCO), Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (fad, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
June 21, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number GUX015487 re #1 Complaint, (fad, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Cover Sheet, filed by Eusebio V Jacob, Marta A Jacob.(Berman, Daniel)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Personal Injury; Exhibit A; and, Demand for Jury Trial against Plastics Engineering Company (PLENCO), a Wisconsin corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., individually and as successor by merger to Allen-Bradley Company, LLC and as successor-in-interest to Rostone Corporation, a Delaware corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue.), filed by Eusebio V Jacob, Marta A Jacob.(Berman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacob et al vs. Plastics Engineering Company (PLENCO)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plastics Engineering Company (PLENCO)
Represented By: Kevin J. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eusebio V. Jacob
Represented By: Daniel James Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta A. Jacob
Represented By: Daniel James Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?