Lau v. Ho
Plaintiff: Gabriel Lau
Defendant: Mandy Yin Man Ho
Case Number: 1:2019cv00123
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Gabriel Lau. (fad, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mandy Yin Man Ho.(fad, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Objection to #7 Report and Recommendations filed by Gabriel Lau. (fad, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Report And Recommendations re #2 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The court must recommend that Plaintiff's Initial Complaint and Amendment be dismissed subject to Plaintiff's ability to amend the Initial Complaint if he is able to allege a basis for federal jurisdiction. Even though the court finds that Plaintiff does not qualify to file this action in forma pauperis, the court also finds it inequitable to require Plaintiff to pay a filing fee for a complaint which on its face fails to establish federal jurisdiction. If Plaintiff is able to amend his Initial Complaint to allege federal jurisdiction, he should then be required to pay the filing fee andother fees and costs herein. Objections to R&R due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 8/5/2019. (fad, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Service filed by Gabriel Lau re #4 Amendment. (vtk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Service. Summons Returned Executed re Complaint filed by Gabriel Lau. Mandy Yin Man Ho served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (vtk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Amendment filed by Gabriel Lau re #1 Complaint. (vtk)
July 31, 2019 Summons Issued as to Mandy Yin Man Ho. (vtk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit filed by Gabriel Lau. (fad, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Mandy Yin Man Ho filed by Gabriel Lau. (fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lau v. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Yin Man Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?