Kam et al v. Sablan et al
Plaintiff: Won Sang Kam, Woo Kyung Gam, Yong Sook Oh, Dong Yeop Kam and Ju Ae Lee
Defendant: Keisha Anne P. Sablan, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Christine P. Quinata, Calvo's Insurance Underwriters, Inc. and DOES 1-15
Case Number: 1:2019cv00130
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed filed by Woo Kyung Gam, Yong Sook Oh, Dong Yeop Kam, Won Sang Kam, Ju Ae Lee. Keisha Anne P. Sablan served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (fad, ) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/4/2019) (fad, ). **Modified on 10/4/2019 to attach corrected pdf** (fad, ).
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed filed by Woo Kyung Gam, Yong Sook Oh, Dong Yeop Kam, Won Sang Kam. Christine P. Quinata served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (fad, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 11/4/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
August 16, 2019 Summons Issued as to Calvo's Insurance Underwriters, Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Christine P. Quinata, Keisha Anne P. Sablan. (fad, )
August 15, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number GUX015665 re #1 Complaint (fad, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Cover Sheet, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Perez, Peter)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue.), filed by All Plaintiffs. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 9/23/2019.(Perez, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kam et al v. Sablan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keisha Anne P. Sablan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine P. Quinata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvo's Insurance Underwriters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Won Sang Kam
Represented By: Edward C Han
Represented By: Peter Cornell Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woo Kyung Gam
Represented By: Edward C Han
Represented By: Peter Cornell Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yong Sook Oh
Represented By: Edward C Han
Represented By: Peter Cornell Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dong Yeop Kam
Represented By: Edward C Han
Represented By: Peter Cornell Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ju Ae Lee
Represented By: Edward C Han
Represented By: Peter Cornell Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?