Merfalen v. APL Maritime, LTD
Plaintiff: Darlene R Merfalen
Defendant: APL Martime, LTD and APL Maritime, LTD
Case Number: 1:2019cv00132
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Referring Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice of Deficiency Re: #10 Notice to Take Deposition; #11 Notice to Take Deposition. Pursuant to CVLR 5, discovery documents, including, but not limited to, notices of taking depositions, shall not be filed with the Court until they are used in the proceeding or the Court orders filing.(fad, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 Notice to Take Deposition of Darlene Merfalen by APL Maritime, LTD.(Smith, Stephen)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Notice to Take Deposition of APL Maritime, Ltd. by Darlene R Merfalen. (Thompson, Randall Todd)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 11/6/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, )
September 4, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement document(s) due by 10/17/2019 by 3:00 p.m. Settlement Conference set for 11/14/2019 09:00 AM in 4th Floor Jury Deliberation Room before Senior Judge Alex R. Munson. (fad, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting #6 Request for Settlement Conference. Settlement conference scheduled for 11/14/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Settlement letters due 10/17/2019 by 3:00 p.m. Signed by Senior Judge Alex R. Munson on 9/4/2019. (fad, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Service (re #6 Request for Settlement Conference ) by Darlene R Merfalen. (Thompson, Randall Todd)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Settlement Conference by Darlene R Merfalen. (Thompson, Randall Todd)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by APL Maritime, LTD.(Smith, Stephen) **Modified on 9/9/2019 to correct spelling of Defendant's name** (fad, ).
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona has been designated preside over this case. (fad, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Of Recusal. Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood recused.. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 8/20/2019. (fad, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by APL Martime, LTD from Superior Court of Guam, case number CV0823-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0993-488878), filed by APL Martime, LTD. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Ntc of Removal - State)(Smith, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merfalen v. APL Maritime, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene R Merfalen
Represented By: Randall Todd W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APL Martime, LTD
Represented By: Stephen C. Smith
Represented By: Michael J. Gatewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APL Maritime, LTD
Represented By: Stephen C. Smith
Represented By: Michael J. Gatewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?