Simon v. Milspray Military Technologies, et al.
Plaintiff: Ezell Simon
Defendant: Green Clover Services, Inc., DOE Entities 1-5, DOE Individuals 6-10, Milspray Military Technologies, DOE Entities 6-10 and DOE Individuals 1-5
Case Number: 1:2019cv00152
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Milspray Military Technologies. (Rapadas, Genevieve)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 Entry of Appearance filed by Genevieve P. Rapadas on behalf of Milspray Military Technologies (Rapadas, Genevieve)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 Entry of Appearance filed by Rodney J. Jacob on behalf of Milspray Military Technologies (Jacob, Rodney)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 3/2/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom. (fad, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed filed by Ezell Simon. Green Clover Services, Inc. served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020. (fad, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed filed by Ezell Simon. Milspray Military Technologies served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020. (fad, )
December 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Green Clover Services, Inc., Milspray Military Technologies. (fad, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Amended Cover Sheet, filed by Ezell Simon.(fad, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 Cover Sheet, filed by Ezell Simon.(Bell, John Richard)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0933-501437.), filed by Ezell Simon. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 1/21/2020.(Bell, John Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon v. Milspray Military Technologies, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Clover Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Individuals 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milspray Military Technologies
Represented By: Rodney J. Jacob
Represented By: Genevieve P. Rapadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Entities 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Individuals 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezell Simon
Represented By: John Richard Bordallo Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?