Guam Waterworks Authority v. Badger Meter, Inc.
Plaintiff: Guam Waterworks Authority
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1, 2 and 3 and Badger Meter, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00032
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Michael J Bordallo
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 12/31/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2021 at 10:45 AM in 3rd floor courtroom VTC before US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo. (fad, )
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order granting #8 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Alex R. Lumaghi for Guam Waterworks Authority admitted.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 10/29/2020. (fad, )
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order granting #7 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. William T. Dowd for Guam Waterworks Authority admitted.. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 10/29/2020. (fad, )
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure filed by Badger Meter, Inc. . (Sterling, Thomas)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Badger Meter, Inc..(Sterling, Thomas)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting #6 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Anne-Louise T. Mittal for Badger Meter, Inc. admitted.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 10/23/2020. (fad, )
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting #5 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Thomas L. Shriner, Jr for Badger Meter, Inc. admitted.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 10/23/2020. (fad, )
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting #4 Stipulation for an Extension of Time to Answer Badger Meter, Inc. answer due 10/29/2020.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 10/23/2020. (fad, )
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 500, receipt number GUX016647 re #7 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - William Dowd (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number PaymentDue), #8 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Alex Lumaghi (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number PaymentDue) (fad, )
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Alex Lumaghi (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number PaymentDue) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Leon Guerrero, Vincent)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - William Dowd (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number PaymentDue) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Leon Guerrero, Vincent)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 500, receipt number GUX016644 re #5 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Thomas L. Shriner, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 250 ), #6 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Anne-Louise T. Mittal ( Filing fee $ 250 ) (fad, )
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Anne-Louise T. Mittal ( Filing fee $ 250 ) filed by Badger Meter, Inc.. (Johnson, Richard)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Thomas L. Shriner, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 250 ) filed by Badger Meter, Inc.. (Johnson, Richard)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Stipulation for an Extension of Time to Answer by Badger Meter, Inc.. (Sterling, Thomas)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number GUX016620 re #1 Notice of Removal, (fad, )
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certificate of Service filed by Badger Meter, Inc.. (Johnson, Richard)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Cover Sheet, filed by Badger Meter, Inc..(Johnson, Richard)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by Badger Meter, Inc. from Superior Court of Guam, case number CV0605-20. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number Payment Due), filed by Badger Meter, Inc.. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Johnson, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guam Waterworks Authority v. Badger Meter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1, 2 and 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badger Meter, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Johnson
Represented By: Anne-Louise T. Mittal
Represented By: Thomas L. Shriner, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas C. Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guam Waterworks Authority
Represented By: Vincent Leon Guerrero
Represented By: Alex R. Lumaghi
Represented By: William T. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?