San Nicolas et al v. Director, Department of Revenue and Taxation
Petitioner: Kathryn K San Nicolas, Michael F.Q. San Nicolas and Kathryn K. San Nicolas
Respondent: Director, Department of Revenue and Taxation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00049
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Michael J Bordallo
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 48 U.S.C. ยง 1424
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 Entry of Appearance filed by James L. Canto, II on behalf of Director, Department of Revenue and Taxation (Canto, James)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 Scheduling and Planning Report , Certificate of Service by All Plaintiffs. (Razzano, Joseph)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 2/23/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2021 at 10:15 AM in 3rd floor courtroom VTC before US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo. (fad, )
December 29, 2020 Summons Issued in a Tax case to Director, Department of Revenue and Taxation. (fad, )
December 29, 2020 Filing fee: $ 60.00, receipt number GUX016788 re #1 Complaint,, Cover Sheet, (fad, ) **Modified to correct filing date**
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number filed by Kathryn K San Nicolas, Michael F.Q. San Nicolas. (Razzano, Joseph)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Director, Department of Revenue and Taxation (Filing fee $ 60.00 receipt number PaymentDue.), Cover Sheet, filed by Michael F.Q. San Nicolas, Kathryn K San Nicolas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Cover Sheet)(Razzano, Joseph) **Modified on 12/28/2020 to correct filing fee - fee due is $60.00** (fad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Nicolas et al v. Director, Department of Revenue and Taxation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kathryn K San Nicolas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael F.Q. San Nicolas
Represented By: Joseph C. Razzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kathryn K. San Nicolas
Represented By: Joseph C. Razzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, Department of Revenue and Taxation
Represented By: James L. Canto, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?