Prutehi Litekyan: Save Ritidian vs. United States Department of the Air Force, et al.
Plaintiff: Prutehi Litekyan: Save Ritidian
Defendant: United States Department of the Air Force, Frank Kendall, United States Department of Defense and Lloyd Austin
Case Number: 1:2022cv00001
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Michael J Bordallo
Referring Judge: Heather L Kennedy
2 Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Filing 16 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 5/6/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in 3rd floor courtroom VTC before US Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy. (fad, )
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or File Rule 12 Motion. Defendant shall file their responsive pleading or Rule 12 motion on or before 4/12/2022. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy on 3/14/2022. (vtk)
March 9, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or File Rule 12 Motion filed by All Defendants. (Rand, Matthew)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Assigning Magistrate Judge for Pretrial Proceedings. Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy assigned. Signed by Chief Judges Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood and Ramona V. Manglona on 3/1/2022. (fad, )
March 1, 2022 Filing 12 Entry of Appearance filed by Matthew Philip Rand on behalf of All Defendants (Rand, Matthew)
February 23, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Returned Executed filed by Prutehi Litekyan: Save Ritidian. All Defendants. (Taimanao-Ayuyu, Rachel)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Of Recusal. Judge US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo recused.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 2/3/2022. (fad, )
January 27, 2022 Filing 9 Amended Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge. (hpg) (White, Charles). (Main Document 9 replaced on 3/1/2022) (White, Charles).
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Receipt (Attachments: #1 Email from Robert E. Rutkowski). (vtk)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting #4 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Thien T. Chau for Prutehi Litekyan: Save Ritidian admitted. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 1/26/2022. (vtk)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting #3 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. David L. Henkin for Prutehi Litekyan: Save Ritidian admitted. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 1/26/2022. (vtk)
January 25, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (hpg)
January 25, 2022 Filing 4 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Thein T. Chau (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue) filed by Prutehi Litekyan: Save Ritidian. (Taimanao-Ayuyu, Rachel)
January 25, 2022 Filing 3 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - David L. Henkin (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue) filed by Prutehi Litekyan: Save Ritidian. (Taimanao-Ayuyu, Rachel)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure filed by Prutehi Litekyan: Save Ritidian . (Taimanao-Ayuyu, Rachel)
January 25, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number PaymentDue.), filed by Prutehi Litekyan: Save Ritidian. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 3/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Taimanao-Ayuyu, Rachel)
January 25, 2022 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number GUX017642 re #3 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - David L. Henkin. (hpg)
January 25, 2022 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number GUX017643 re #4 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Thein T. Chau. (hpg)
January 25, 2022 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number GUX017641 re #1 Complaint. (hpg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prutehi Litekyan: Save Ritidian vs. United States Department of the Air Force, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prutehi Litekyan: Save Ritidian
Represented By: David L. Henkin
Represented By: Rachel M. Taimanao-Ayuyu
Represented By: Thien T. Chau
Represented By: David Lane Henkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Air Force
Represented By: Matthew Philip Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Kendall
Represented By: Matthew Philip Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Matthew Philip Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Austin
Represented By: Matthew Philip Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?