Pacific American Title and Insurance Company et al v. Evanston Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Pacific American Title and Insurance Company, Lourdes P. San Nicolas and Pacific American Title Insurance & Escrow Company
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00021
Filed: August 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Michael J Bordallo
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2022 Filing 23 Scheduling and Planning Report . (Mann, Wilfred)
October 24, 2022 Filing 22 Concise Statement re #19 Response by Evanston Insurance Company. (Walsh, Joshua) (related document(s): #11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) **Modified on 10/25/2022 to add relation to document no. 11** (fad, ).
October 24, 2022 Filing 21 Declaration of Daniel R. Formeller re #19 Response by Evanston Insurance Company. (Walsh, Joshua) (related document(s): #11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) **Modified on 10/25/2022 to add relation to document no. 11 and edit docket text** (fad)
October 24, 2022 Filing 20 Declaration of Jeanette M. Bourey re #19 Response by Evanston Insurance Company. (Walsh, Joshua) (related document(s): #11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) **Modified on 10/25/2022 to add relation to document no. 11 and edit docket text** (fad).
October 24, 2022 Filing 19 Response re #11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Evanston Insurance Company. (Walsh, Joshua)
October 4, 2022 Filing 18 Certificate of Service (re #17 Corporate Disclosure ) by Pacific American Title Insurance & Escrow Company. (Mann, Wilfred)
October 4, 2022 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure filed by Pacific American Title Insurance & Escrow Company . (Mann, Wilfred)
October 3, 2022 Filing 16 Certificate of Service (re #14 Declaration, #12 Memorandum in Support, #13 Concise Statement, #15 Declaration of Counsel, #11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ) by Pacific American Title Insurance & Escrow Company, Lourdes P. San Nicolas. (Mann, Wilfred)
October 3, 2022 Filing 15 Declaration of Bill R. Mann re #11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Pacific American Title Insurance & Escrow Company, Lourdes P. San Nicolas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Mann, Wilfred) **Modified on 10/25/2022 to edit docket text** (fad, ).
October 3, 2022 Filing 14 Declaration of Lourdes San Nicolas re #11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Pacific American Title Insurance & Escrow Company, Lourdes P. San Nicolas. (Mann, Wilfred) **Modified on 10/25/2022 to edit docket text** (fad, ).
October 3, 2022 Filing 13 Concise Statement re #12 Memorandum in Support, #11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Pacific American Title Insurance & Escrow Company, Lourdes P. San Nicolas. (Mann, Wilfred)
October 3, 2022 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re: #11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Lourdes P. San Nicolas, Pacific American Title Insurance & Escrow Company. (Mann, Wilfred) . filed by Pacific American Title Insurance & Escrow Company, Lourdes P. San Nicolas. (Mann, Wilfred)
October 3, 2022 Filing 11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Lourdes P. San Nicolas, Pacific American Title Insurance & Escrow Company. (Mann, Wilfred)
September 14, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Walsh, Joshua)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting #7 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Daniel R. Formeller. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 9/13/2022. (hpg)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting #6 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Jihoon Kim. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 9/13/2022. (hpg)
September 9, 2022 Filing 7 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Daniel R. Formeller (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue) filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Walsh, Joshua)
September 9, 2022 Filing 6 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Jihoon Kim (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue) filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Walsh, Joshua)
September 9, 2022 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number GUX018087 re #6 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Jihoon Kim. (hpg)
September 9, 2022 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number GUX018088 re #7 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Daniel R. Formeller. (hpg)
September 6, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Evanston Insurance Company.(Walsh, Joshua)
August 29, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
August 29, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (fad, )
August 29, 2022 Filing 2 Affidavit of Joshua D. Walsh re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (fad, )
August 29, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by Evanston Insurance Company from Superior Court of Guam, case number CV0411-22. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number GUX018064). Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 10/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific American Title and Insurance Company et al v. Evanston Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific American Title and Insurance Company
Represented By: Wilfred R. Mann
Represented By: Wilfred R Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lourdes P. San Nicolas
Represented By: Wilfred R. Mann
Represented By: Wilfred R Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific American Title Insurance & Escrow Company
Represented By: Wilfred R Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua D. Walsh
Represented By: Daniel Richard Formeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?