Gateway Network Connections, LLC. et al v. Matulich
Plaintiff: Gateway Network Connections, LLC. and Asia Connectivity Elements, Inc.
Defendant: Russell Matulich
Case Number: 1:2022cv00024
Filed: October 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Michael J Bordallo
Referring Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 24 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 1/12/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2023 at 10:30 AM in 3rd floor courtroom VTC before US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo. (vtk)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order granting #20 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Chase Tajima for Russell Matulich admitted. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 12/1/2022. (vtk)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Virtual Order granting #19 Request for Hearing by Designated Judge Ramona V. Manglona. #18 Motion to Dismiss set for 1/25/2023 at 11:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Designated Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (vtk)
November 24, 2022 Filing 21 Motion to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Asia Connectivity Elements, Inc., Gateway Network Connections, LLC.. (Vukovic, Adam)
November 21, 2022 Filing 20 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Chase Tajima (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number GUX018207) filed by Russell Matulich. (fad, )
November 19, 2022 Filing 19 Request for Hearing re #18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Compel Arbitration filed by Russell Matulich. (fad, )
November 19, 2022 Filing 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Compel Arbitration filed by Russell Matulich. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Russell A. Matulich in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibits to Declaration of Russell A. Matulich, #3 Declaration of Chase Tajima in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit O to Declaration of Chase Tajima)(fad, )
November 18, 2022 Filing 17 Entry of Appearance filed by Minakshi V. Hemlani on behalf of Russell Matulich (fad, )
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order granting #11 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Adam A. Vukovic for Gateway Network Connections, LLC. admitted.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 11/3/2022. (fad, )
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order granting #10 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Meryl Macklin for Gateway Network Connections, LLC. admitted.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 11/3/2022. (fad, )
October 31, 2022 Filing 14 Designated Judge Ramona V. Manglona has been designated preside over this case. (fad, )
October 31, 2022 Filing fee received: $ 800.00, Pay.gov Tracking ID: 2726CHKM re #11 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - ADAM A. VUKOVIC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue), #10 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - MERYL MACKLIN (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PAYMENTDUE) (fad, )
October 28, 2022 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice of Fee due - Filing Fee of $800.00 OVERDUE. Please pay no later than close of business Monday, October 31, 2022. re #11 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - ADAM A. VUKOVIC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue), #10 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - MERYL MACKLIN (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PAYMENTDUE) (fad, )
October 27, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure filed by Asia Connectivity Elements, Inc. . (Perez, Peter)
October 26, 2022 Filing 11 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - ADAM A. VUKOVIC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Terlaje, Jacqueline)
October 26, 2022 Filing 10 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - MERYL MACKLIN (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PAYMENTDUE) filed by Asia Connectivity Elements, Inc., Gateway Network Connections, LLC.. (Terlaje, Jacqueline)
October 26, 2022 Filing 9 Affidavit re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #8 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Due Diligence filed by Asia Connectivity Elements, Inc., Gateway Network Connections, LLC.. (Terlaje, Jacqueline)
October 26, 2022 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service for Complaint and Summons FRCP Rule 4 Substituted Service served on Christine Matulich on 10/20/2022, filed by Asia Connectivity Elements, Inc., Gateway Network Connections, LLC.. (Terlaje, Jacqueline)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Of Self-Recusal. Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood recused. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 10/14/2022. (vtk)
October 14, 2022 Filing 6 Cover Sheet, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Terlaje, Jacqueline)
October 13, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure filed by Gateway Network Connections, LLC. . (Terlaje, Jacqueline)
October 13, 2022 Filing 4 Cover Sheet, filed by Gateway Network Connections, LLC..(Terlaje, Jacqueline)
October 13, 2022 Summons Issued as to Russell Matulich. (fad, )
October 12, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
October 12, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. Plaintiffs' Corporate Disclosure Statement and Cover Sheet DUE. (fad, )
October 7, 2022 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number PAY.Gov. Tracking ID 271V396N re #1 Complaint (fad, )
October 7, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Russell Matulich (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 76301874872.), filed by All Plaintiffs. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 11/16/2022.(Terlaje, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gateway Network Connections, LLC. et al v. Matulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gateway Network Connections, LLC.
Represented By: Jacqueline Taitano Terlaje
Represented By: Adam Andrew Vukovic
Represented By: Meryl Macklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asia Connectivity Elements, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline Taitano Terlaje
Represented By: Adam Andrew Vukovic
Represented By: Peter Cornell Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Matulich
Represented By: Chase Tajima
Represented By: Minakshi V. Hemlani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?