E.M.B. Electrical Inc. v. Granite-Obayashi, a Joint Venture
Plaintiff: E.M.B. Electrical Inc.
Defendant: Granite-Obayashi, a Joint Venture
Case Number: 1:2024cv00006
Filed: March 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Michael J Bordallo
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Berman, Daniel)
March 11, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed Granite-Obayashi, a Joint Venture served on 3/11/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. (Berman, Daniel)
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge. (kbma)
March 8, 2024 Filing 2 Complaint for Breach of Contract and to Compel Arbitration against Granite-Obayashi, a Joint Venture (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number PaymentDue.), filed by E.M.B. Electrical Inc.. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 4/17/2024.(Berman, Daniel)
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 Cover Sheet, filed by E.M.B. Electrical Inc..(Berman, Daniel)
March 8, 2024 Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number 100000282 re #2 Complaint. (kbma)
March 8, 2024 Summons Issued as to Granite-Obayashi, a Joint Venture. (kbma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.M.B. Electrical Inc. v. Granite-Obayashi, a Joint Venture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.M.B. Electrical Inc.
Represented By: Daniel James Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite-Obayashi, a Joint Venture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?