Government of Guam v. Black Construction Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Government of Guam
Defendant: Black Construction Corporation, Brown and Caldwell, Geo-Logic Associates and GHD, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00011
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Michael J Bordallo
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Filing 15 Entry of Appearance filed by Mitchell F. Thompson on behalf of Geo-Logic Associates (Thompson, Mitchell)
June 19, 2024 Filing 14 Entry of Appearance filed by Stephen Christopher Smith on behalf of GHD, Inc. (Smith, Stephen)
June 4, 2024 Summons Issued as to Black Construction Corporation, Brown and Caldwell, GHD, Inc., Geo-Logic Associates. (atp)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order granting #8 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Robert I. Steiner for Government of Guam admitted. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 5/31/2024. (kbma)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order granting #7 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. James B. Saylor for Government of Guam admitted. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 5/31/2024. (kbma)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting #5 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. William J. Jackson for Government of Guam admitted.. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 5/31/2024. (fad, )
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting #6 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Lauren Shah for Government of Guam admitted.. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 5/31/2024. (fad, )
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting #4 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. John Dalston Smith Gilmour for Government of Guam admitted.. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 5/31/2024. (fad, )
May 30, 2024 Filing 8 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Robert I. Steiner (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGUDC-700060) filed by Government of Guam. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Botha, D Graham) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2024: #3 Original Pro Hac Vice Application, #4 Original Declaration) (kbma, ).
May 30, 2024 Filing 7 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - James B. Saylor (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGUDC-700057) filed by Government of Guam. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Botha, D Graham) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2024: #3 Original Pro Hac Vice Application, #4 Original Declaration) (kbma, ).
May 8, 2024 Filing 6 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Lauren H. Shah (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGUDC-696605) filed by Government of Guam. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Botha, D Graham) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2024: #3 Original Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lauren H. Shah, #4 Original Declaration of Lauren Shah in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (fad, ). **Modified on 5/14/2024 to add original Application and Declaration** (fad, ).
May 8, 2024 Filing 5 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - William J. Jackson (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGUDC-696604) filed by Government of Guam. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Botha, D Graham)
May 8, 2024 Filing 4 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - John D.S. Gilmour (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGUDC-696603) filed by Government of Guam. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Botha, D Graham)
May 7, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge. (kbma)
May 6, 2024 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Government of Guam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint)(Botha, D Graham)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint against Black Construction Corporation, Brown & Caldwell, GHD, Inc., Geo-Logic Associates (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGUDC-696247.), filed by Government of Guam. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 6/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit A - Part 5, #6 [Proposed] Summons - Black Construction Corporation, #7 [Proposed] Summons - Brown & Caldwell, #8 [Proposed] Summons - Geo-Logic Associates, Inc., #9 [Proposed] Summons - GHD, Inc., #10 Cover Sheet)(Botha, D Graham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government of Guam v. Black Construction Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government of Guam
Represented By: D Graham Botha, Jr
Represented By: James B. Saylor
Represented By: John Dalston Smith Gilmour
Represented By: Lauren Shah
Represented By: Robert I. Steiner
Represented By: William J. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Construction Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown and Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geo-Logic Associates
Represented By: Mitchell F. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHD, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?