Sylvester et al v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Valerie Sylvester, David Pang, Andrew Garcia, Ruth Camargo, Chris Hubbard, Stacey Collins, Randall Bandmann, Kelly Engle, Pam Gould and Erik Coral-Sands
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund and Doe Entities and Individuals 1-100
Case Number: 1:2007cv00409
Filed: July 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Injunctive/Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2007 Filing 33
EP: Motion Hearing held on 10/1/2007 re 9 Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., and Menu Foods, Inc.'s Motion to Stay All Proceedings. Motion taken under advisement. Court to issue order. 17 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Motion taken under advisement. Court to issue order. Motions Taken Under Advisement: 9 and 17. (FTR C5 - 9:40-10:02:58am.) (Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, )
September 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION re 29 31. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 9/27/07. (eps ) -- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that said Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission is granted, and MATTHEW LEPORE is permitted to appear pro hac vice in this case.
September 14, 2007 Filing 29
Filing fee: $ 225, receipt number 240917 - PRO HAC VICE: MATTHEW LEPORE (eps )
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26
STIPULATION Re: (1) Service of First Amended Complaint on Menu Foods Income Fund; (2) Naming of Menu Food Income Fund As A Defendant and (3) Deadline For All Defendants To Answer or Otherwise Respond To The First Amended Complaint, Filed 06/22/07 AND ORDER. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (eps )
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM LOCAL RULES 20. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (eps ) -- Under the circumstances, the Court finds good cause to allow counsel relief from the deadlines for the aforementioned filings
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21
ORDER granting 16 Defendants Menu Foods, Inc., and Menu Foods Holdings, Inc.'s EX PARTE APPLICATION for Second Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaitnfiffs' First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 8/28/07. [Defendant Menu Foods, Inc. answer due 11/3/2007; Defendant Menu Foods Holdings, Inc. answer due 11/3/2007] (afc)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MENU FOODS INCOME FUND'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED 06/22/07 8.. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 8/10/07. (eps ) -- The Court, considering the circumstances presented in this case and the possibility that this case may be transferred to the District of New Jersey as a Multi District Litigation action, hereby GRANTS Defendant Menu Foods Income Fund a thirty (30) day extension in which to file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, filed on June 22, 2007.
July 27, 2007 Filing 3
Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 240356 (eps )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sylvester et al v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Chad P. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Chad P. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Represented By: Chad P. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities and Individuals 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Sylvester
Represented By: Emily A. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pang
Represented By: Emily A. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Garcia
Represented By: Emily A. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Camargo
Represented By: Emily A. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Hubbard
Represented By: Emily A. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Collins
Represented By: Emily A. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Bandmann
Represented By: Emily A. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Engle
Represented By: Emily A. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pam Gould
Represented By: Emily A. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Coral-Sands
Represented By: Emily A. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?