Kamaole Pointe Development LP et al v. County of Maui et al

Plaintiff: Kamaole Pointe Development LP and Alaku Pointe LP
Defendant: County of Maui, G. Riki Hokama, Danny A. Mateo, Michelle Anderson, Gladys Coelho Baisa, Jo Anne Johnson, Bill Kauakea Medeiros, Michael J. Molina, Joseph Pontanilla, Michael P. Victorino, Charmaine Tavares and Vanessa A. Medeiros
Case Number: 1:2007cv00447
Filed: August 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: DAVID ALAN EZRA
Referring Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER DENYING 186 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING 183 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 9/29/2009. [Order follows hearing held 9/28/2009; Minutes-dock et entry no. 205 ] (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER DENYING 121 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 119 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT "...[T]his Court (1) DISMISSES Plaintiffs' as-applied substantiv e due process and equal protection claims under both the United States and Hawaii constitutions as unripe, (2) DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to its as-applied procedural due process claim, (3) DENIES Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' procedural due process claim, and (4) DENIES Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' preemption claim under Hawaii Revised Statutes §§ 46-141 to 46-148...." Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 11/25/2008. (afc)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 83 . ~ Summary judgment is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' facial equal protection and facial due process claims. Summary judgment is DENIED with respec t to County Defendants "class of one" equal protection argument. Plaintiffs' as-applied equal protection and as-applied due process claims remain viable ~ Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 9/9/08. [related: 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Declaring Ordinance 3418 Void on Its Face Under the Doctrine of Unconstitutional Conditions; 35 County Defendants' M/SJ or in the alternative M/PSJ. 81 : Order.] (afc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kamaole Pointe Development LP et al v. County of Maui et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamaole Pointe Development LP
Represented By: Robert G. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaku Pointe LP
Represented By: Robert G. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Maui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Riki Hokama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny A. Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladys Coelho Baisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Kauakea Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Pontanilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Victorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charmaine Tavares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa A. Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?