Bandalan v. Castle & Cooke Resorts, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Bandalan
Defendant: Castle & Cooke Resorts, LLC, John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Government Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2007cv00591
Filed: December 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: DAVID ALAN EZRA
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING 36 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by District JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on July 24, 2009. (bbb, )
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER ON THE AMOUNT OF RULE 11 SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. ~ The Court, as Special Master, RECOMMENDS that the district judge award Defendant attorneys' fees in the amount of $17,539.78. ~ Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 6/30/2009. re: 28 M/Rule 11 Sanctions; 31 Order granting M/Rule 11 Sanctions. (afc)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS. 28 . ~ "...Defendant may file all relevant documentation with the magistrate judge to support the calculation for the amount of the sanctions awarded hereunder." ~ . Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 12/22/2008. (afc)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 18 . Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 11/12/2008. (afc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bandalan v. Castle & Cooke Resorts, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle & Cooke Resorts, LLC
Represented By: Sarah O. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Government Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bandalan
Represented By: Barry L. Sooalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?