Won et al v. England et al
Plaintiff: |
Seo Jeong Won and Park Young Ja |
Defendant: |
Raymond L. England, Joseph Sweeney and USA Federal Credit Union |
Case Number: |
1:2007cv00606 |
Filed: |
December 17, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E KOBAYASHI |
Presiding Judge: |
J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 21, 2010 |
Filing
249
ORDER ADOPTING Magistrate's FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION for 248 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/20/10. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
March 12, 2010 |
Filing
246
ORDER ADOPTING Magistrate's FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION for (236 in 1:07-cv-00606-JMS-LEK) Findings and Recommendations,. Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/12/10. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00606-JMS-LEK, 1:08-cv-00158-JMS-LEK(gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
February 18, 2010 |
Filing
242
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING USA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS IN CIVIL NO. 08-00158. 228 Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/18/2010. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
February 11, 2010 |
Filing
236
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION To Dismiss With Prejudice. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 2/11/10. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing
228
REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING USA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS IN CIVIL NO. 08-00158 re 196 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 1/7/10. (This Court, acting as Special Master, FINDS AND RECOMMENDS that USA FCU's Motion for Order Granting USA Federal Credit Union Attorneys' Fees and Costs in Civil No. 08-00158, filed on July 14, 2009, be DENIED.) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERV ICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
July 1, 2009 |
Filing
187
ORDER Granting USA Federal Credit Union's Motion For Summary Judgment On Raymond England's Claims Against USA Federal Credit Union re 162 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/30/09. (gls, )
|
June 12, 2009 |
Filing
173
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART FEDERAL CREDIT UNION'S AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS RAYMOND ENGLAND'S COMPLAINT AND ORDERING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING 108 - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/12/09. (The court DENI ES the FCU's Motion without prejudice to the extent it asks the court to strike England's Amended Complaint, and GRANTS the FCU's Motion to the extent it argues that Monette England is a necessary party. The court further orders both p arties to submit supplemental briefing addressing whether it is feasible to add Monette England as a party and if not, whether she is indispensable. England may also submit supplemental briefing addressing the FCU's argument that England's claims fail as a matter of law because he has no interest in the funds at issue. The parties' simultaneous briefing is due by June 26, 2009.) (emt, )
|
December 12, 2008 |
Filing
133
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT V OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 126 - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/12/08. (emt, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?