Prudential Insurance Company of America, The v. Estate of Joel Solevilla Norva et al
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Defendant: Estate of Joel Solevilla Norva, Lillian B. Koller, Azucena B. Crawford and Clifford J. Crawford
Case Number: 1:2007cv00616
Filed: December 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION 55 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/23/10. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 12/28/09. (emt, )
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES 38 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 12/8/09. (In accordance with the foregoing, this Court, acting as Special Master, FIND S AND RECOMMENDS that Prudential's Motion for Determination of Reasonable Attorneys' Fees, filed on June 22, 2009, be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Court RECOMMENDS that the district judge award Prudential $25,000.00 in attor neys' fees and that the district judge DENY the Motion in all other respects.) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION 32 - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/5/09. (emt, )
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISCHARGE 28 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 4/15/09. ( Objections to F&R due by 4/29/2009) (The Court RECOMMENDS that the district judge enter an order as follo ws: 1. Plaintiff shall deposit the benefits from Yolanda C. Crawford's life insurance policy ("Interpleader Funds") with this district court; 2. the Interpleader Funds are to be held under the district court's jurisdiction until t here is a final determination of the ownership thereof; 3. upon depositing the Interpleader Funds with the district court, Plaintiff shall be dismissed from this action with prejudice; 4. that final judgment in Plaintiff's favor be ent ered upon the deposit of the Interpleader Funds as there is no just reason for delay pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b); 5. Plaintiff is entitled to recover its reasonable attorney's fees and expenses incurred in the instant a ction, which shall be charged against the Interpleader Funds, subject to a determination of the amount of the award based on a filing of proof of such attorney's fees and expenses; and 6. pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2361, the defendants in this case are prohibited from instituting or prosecuting any proceeding in any state or federal court affecting the property, instrument, or obligation involved in this action.) (emt, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The v. Estate of Joel Solevilla Norva et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Represented By: Wilson M. Loo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Joel Solevilla Norva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillian B. Koller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azucena B. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford J. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?