July 25, 2011 |
Filing
1343
ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 7 to Exclude The Expert Report of Dr. Ron Blair, Doc. No. 1182 ; and (2) Denying Defendants James Y. Sim, M.D. and James Y. Sim, M.D., LLC's Motion In Limine Regarding Admissibility of Pl aintiffs' Expert Report Disclosed In Proceeding In The County Court of Dallas County Texas, Doc. No. 1179 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/22/11. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
June 23, 2011 |
Filing
1173
ORDER (1) DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE ANY TESTIMONY, EVIDENCE, OPINIONS, OR ARGUMENT THAT SUBSEQUENT MEDICAL PROVIDERS IN DALLAS ACTED NEGLIGENTLY WITH REGARD TO JESSICA DURHAM'S MEDICAL CARE OR CAUSEED HER INJURI ES, DOC. NO. 1102 ; (2) GRANTING DEFENDANTS BYRON H. IZUKA, M.D.'S AND BYRON H. IZUKA, M.D., LLC'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO ADMIT EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, AND ARGUMENT REGARDING THE CARE PROVIDED TO JESSICA DURHAM BY SUBSEQUENT MEDICAL PROVIDERS IN DALLAS, TEXAS, DOC. NO. 1106 ; AND (3) GRANTING DEFENDANTS JAMES Y. SIM, M.D. AND JAMES Y. SIM, M.D., LLC'S MOTION INLIMINE REGARDING ADMISSIBILITY OF PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION FILED IN THE COUNTY COURT OF DALLAS COUNTY TEXAS, DOC. N O. 1099 - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/23/11. ("Based on the above, the court: (1) DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Any Testimony, Evidence, Opinions, or Argument That Subsequent Medical Prov iders in Dallas Acted Negligently with Regard to Jessica Durham's Medical Care or Caused Her Injuries, Doc. No. 1102 ; (2) GRANTS Dr. Izuka's Motion in Limine to Admit Evidence, Testimony, and Argument Regarding the Care Provided to Jessic a Durham by Subsequent Medical Providers in Dallas, Texas, Doc. No. 1106 , as well as Kapiolani Defendants' and Dr. Sim' s Joinders in this Motion (Doc. Nos. 1109 , 1132 ); and (3) GRANTS Dr. Sim's Motion in Limine Regarding Admissi bility of Plaintiffs' Original Petition Filed in the County Court of Dallas County Texas, Doc. No. 1099 , as well as Dr. Izuka's and Kapiolani Defendants' Joinders in this Motion (Doc. Nos. 1105 , 1107 )." ) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications shall be served by first class mail at the addresses of record on June 24, 2011.
|
March 23, 2011 |
Filing
1088
ORDER (1) Granting Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion For Approval of Good Faith Settlement, Doc. No. 1008; And (2) Granting Plaintiffs' Second Substantive Joinder To Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion For Approval of Good Faith Settlement, Doc. No. 1055 re 1008 , 1055 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/23/11. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
October 8, 2010 |
Filing
988
ORDER DENYING COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANT DENISE ANN JENKINS AS THE ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF MARK ALLEN DURHAM'S PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE KOBAYASHI'S JULY 27, 2010 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DEN Y COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANT'S PETITION FOR FINDING OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENTS (DOC. NO. 972 ) - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/8/10. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive elec tronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
September 10, 2010 |
Filing
963
ORDER: (1) DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SPOLIATION SANCTIONS, DOC. NO. 859 , SEEKING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS TO LIABILITY AGAINST MAUI WINDSURFING VANS, INC. AND (2) DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SPOLIATION SANCTIONS, DOC . NO. 859 , SEEKING AN ADVERSE INFERENCE JURY INSTRUCTION - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/10/10. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
August 31, 2010 |
Filing
954
ORDER Adopting Magistrate Judge Kobayashi's July 27, 2010 Findings And Recommendation To Deny Counterclaim Defendant's Petition For Finding of Good Faith Settlements re 886 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/31/10. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing
887
ORDER: (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART JAMES Y. SIM, M.D. AND JAMES Y. SIM, M.D., LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO 792 ); AND (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART KAPIOLANI MEDICAL CENTER FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN, HAWAII PA CIFIC HEALTH, KAPIOLANI MEDICAL SPECIALISTS, AND SHILPA J. PATEL, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. 793 ) - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/28/10. ("Remaining against these Defendants are Plaintiffs' negligence claim against Dr. Sim based on failure to communicate specific recommendations for cardiology follow-up, and Plaintiffs' negligence claim against Kapiolani Defendants for (1) failing to communicate to CMC the need for specific and urg ent follow-up for Jessica's enlarged aorta; (2) limiting Jessica's transfer for orthopedic treatment (as opposed to including cardiology follow-up); and (3) failing to communicate to CMC new developments regarding Jessica's orthopedic condition.") (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
June 30, 2010 |
Filing
849
ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiffs' Motion To Exclude Expert Designation of Clifford Wong, PH.D. And Evidence of, Related to, Reported THC In Mark Durham's Postmortem Blood Sample in re 780 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOB AYASHI on 6/30/10. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
June 17, 2010 |
Filing
829
ORDER Affirming The Magistrate Judge's April 27, 2010 Discovery Order (Doc. No. 787) re 798 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/17/10. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive el ectronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
February 17, 2010 |
Filing
742
ORDER Denying Ford Motor Company's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On Plaintiffs' Claim For Punitive Damages (Doc. No. 518) 518 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/17/10. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
February 12, 2010 |
Filing
740
ORDER Denying Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion For Summary Judgment Based on Federal Preemption 523 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/12/10. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications will be served by first class mail on: 2/17/2010.
|
February 10, 2010 |
Filing
734
ORDER Denying Ford Motor Company's Motion To Dismiss or, Alternatively, Exclude Certain Evidence And Enter An Adverse Instruction Against Plaintiffs (Doc. No. 529) 529 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/9/10. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
January 21, 2010 |
Filing
684
ORDER (1) Denying Defendant Maui Windsurfing Vans, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment As To Counts IV and IX of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, And For Summary Judgment On Its Counter Claim Against Plaintiffs' (Doc. No. 515); And (2) Denying Defendant Maui Windsurfing Vans, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment As to Its Cross-Claim Against Ford Motor Company (Doc No. 525) in re 515 ; 525 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/21/10. (gls, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
December 8, 2009 |
Filing
550
ORDER ADOPTING Magistrate's FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION for 497 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/8/09. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
November 17, 2009 |
Filing
497
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION To Grant Patty Conte's Motion For Approval Of Good Faith Settlement re 407 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 11/17/09. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
July 16, 2009 |
Filing
366
ORDER ADOPTING Magistrate Judge Kobayashi's FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION To Deny The Estate of Mark Allen Durham's Petition For Finding of Good Faith Settlements for 324 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/15/09. (gls, )
|
June 18, 2009 |
Filing
333
ORDER Denying The Estate of Mark Allen Durham's Motion For Reconsideration 327 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 6/18/09. (gls, )
|
May 29, 2009 |
Filing
324
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION To Deny The Estate of Mark Allan Durham's Petition For Finding of Good Faith Settlements re 216 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 5/29/09. (gls, )
|