R & R Acquisitions Texas LLC v. Kauai Resort Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
R & R Acquisitions Texas LLC |
Defendant: |
Kauai Resort Partners, LLC, Title Guaranty Escrow Services, Inc., John Does 1-50 and Doe Partnerships, Corporations, Governental Units, or Other Entities 1-50 |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv00348 |
Filed: |
July 30, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Contract: Other Office |
County: |
Kauai |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
SAMUEL P KING |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 2, 2009 |
Filing
84
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER 79 . Signed by JUDGE SAMUEL P KING on 9/2/09. ~ that Plaintiff's First Motion forAttorneys Fees and Costs, filed June 18, 2009, be DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
August 19, 2009 |
Filing
80
ORDER (1) AFFIRMING ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE, AND (2) ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 69 , 72 - signed by Judge Samuel King. (ecs, ) ~ (1) The Appeal 72 of the Order Denying Mori Golfs Motion to Intervene 69 is DENIED. The Order Denying Mori Golfs Motion to Intervene is AFFIRMED; and (2) The Objections 73 to the Findings and Recommendation that Mori Golfs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction be Denied 69 are OVERRULED. The Court ADOPTS the Findings and Recommendation.
|
August 14, 2009 |
Filing
79
REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER RECOMMENDING THAT PLAINTIFF R & R ACQUISITIONS TEXAS, LLC'S FIRST MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS BE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE 63 . (Objections to F & R due 8/29/09) Objections to F&R due by 9/8/2009 . Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 8/14/09. (ecs, ) Objections due date: 9/8/09 -text modified on 8/17/2009 (ecs, ).
|
June 30, 2009 |
Filing
69
ORDER DENYING INTERVENOR MORI GOLF (KAUAI) LLC'S 45 MOTION TO INTERVENE FILED ON MAY 11, 2009 AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS THAT INTERVENOR MORI GOLF (KAUAI) LLC'S 49 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED ON MAY 18, 2009 BE DENIED ( Objections to F&R due by 7/15/2009). Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 6/29/09. (ecs, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?