O'Phelan et al v. Meek et al
Plaintiff: |
Ellen J. O'Phelan and Dan J. O'Phelan |
Defendant: |
Jeff Meek and Marylou Askren |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv00407 |
Filed: |
September 9, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
P.I.: Other Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
HELEN GILLMOR |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 16, 2009 |
Filing
95
ORDER ADOPTING MARCH 30, 2009 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REMAND AND AWARD DEFENDANT ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (DOC. NO. 90) AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS THERETO FILED ON APRIL 16, 2009 (DOC. NO. 91 ) AND AFFIRMING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S DENIAL OF: (1) PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO SUPPLEMENT TO FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REMAND (DOC. NO. 55); (2) PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC. NO. 60 );(3) PLAINTIFFS' SECOND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC. NO. 70); (4) PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR HEARING MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING (DOC. NO. 71); (5) PLAINTIFFS' FIRST MOTION FOR GERARD LEE LOY TO COMPLY WITH COURT RULES (DOC . NO. 78); (6) PLAINTIFFS' SECOND MOTION THAT EVIDENCE OF GERARD LEE LOY'S CREDIBILITY BE REVIEWED (DOC. NO. 81); (7) DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS (DOC. NO. 82); (8) PLAINTIFFS' FIRST MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES (DOC. 83); AND (9) REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM AND MOTION TO RECONSIDER (DOC. NO. 89). Signed by District JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on June 16, 2009. (bbb, )
|
January 22, 2009 |
Filing
54
ORDER ADOPTING 46 MAGISTRATE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Chief JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on January 21, 2009. (bbb, )
|
December 22, 2008 |
Filing
46
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT DEFENDANT MARYLOU ASKREN'S 8 MOTION TO REMAND. Objections to F&R due by 1/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on December 22, 2008. (bbb, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?