HRPT Properties Trust et al v. Lingle
Plaintiff: HRPT Properties Trust, Masters Properties LLC, Orville Properties LLC, Robin 1 Properties LLC, Tanaka Properties LLC, LTMAC Properties, LLC, TSM Properties LLC and Z&A Properties
Defendant: Linda Lingle
Case Number: 1:2009cv00375
Filed: August 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES 123 ; 126 ; 129 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 2/28/11. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVIC EParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES 123 ; 126 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 2/25/11. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParti cipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING DEFENDANT LINDA LINGLE'S SECOND COUNTER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND DENYING INTERVENOR-DEFENDANT CITIZENS FOR FAIR VALUATION'S COUNTER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [67 ], 80 , 83 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/31/10. (The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment for HRPT and to close this case.) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants reg istered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 14 , 43 , 45 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 12/22/09. (The parties are directed to discuss among themselves a discovery schedule or, if un able to reach agreement, to meet promptly with the Magistrate Judge to discuss the schedule.) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HRPT Properties Trust et al v. Lingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HRPT Properties Trust
Represented By: Bruce D. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masters Properties LLC
Represented By: Bruce D. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orville Properties LLC
Represented By: Bruce D. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin 1 Properties LLC
Represented By: Bruce D. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanaka Properties LLC
Represented By: Bruce D. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LTMAC Properties, LLC
Represented By: Bruce D. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TSM Properties LLC
Represented By: Bruce D. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z&A Properties
Represented By: Bruce D. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Lingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?