Estate of Agnes P. Tahilan v. Friendly Care Home Health Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
The Estate of Agnes P. Tahilan |
Defendant: |
Friendly Care Home Health Services, Inc., Michael Lee Folkes, John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Doe Corporations, Doe Non-Profit Corporations 1-10, Doe Governmental Units 1-10 and Doe Entities 1-10 |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv00430 |
Filed: |
September 11, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
DAVID ALAN EZRA |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E KOBAYASHI |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 20, 2010 |
Filing
51
ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS: "On the basis of the foregoing, this Court AWARDS Plaintiff $937.49 in attorneys' fees and $196.45 in costs, for a total award of $1,133.94. The Court ORDERS Defendant to pay this amount to Plaintiff's counsel by no later than November 17, 2010. IT IS SO ORDERED." re 45 Declaration. Signed by Magistrate JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on September 17, 2010. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE< /center>Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
August 4, 2010 |
Filing
50
ORDER: 1) DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 40 ; 2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 29 ; AND 3) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING DEFENSE 29 . Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 8/3/2010 . [Order follows hearing on Motions 29 and 40 held 8/02/2010; Minutes-docket entry no. 49 (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
November 2, 2009 |
Filing
12
ORDER GRANTING 5 DEFENDANT FRIENDLY CARE HOME HEALTH SERVICES, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR IMPROPER VENUE. Defendant-party Friendly Care Home Health Services, Inc. terminated. Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 11/2/2009. [Order follows hearing on Motion 5 held 11/2/2009; Minutes-docket entry no. 11 ] (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?