Mizukami v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: |
Glenn K. Mizukami |
Defendant: |
Donna C. Edwards, Thomas D. Collins, III and Does 1-10 |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv00572 |
Filed: |
December 4, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
DAVID ALAN EZRA |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 11, 2010 |
Filing
9
ORDER ADOPTING 8 MAGISTRATE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 2/11/2010. (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing
8
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS 6 THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ORDER DENYING 7 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 1/25/2010. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Glenn K. Mizukami, as a Participant not registered to receive electronic not ifications, will be served by first class mail on January 26, 2010. A Copy of the Findings and Recommendation with the proposed order of adoption, has been served January 25, 2010 upon the chambers of Judge David Alan Ezra via the orders e-mail address: ezra_orders@hid.uscourts.gov.
|
January 19, 2010 |
Filing
5
ORDER ADOPTING 4 MAGISTRATE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 1/19/2010. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
December 29, 2009 |
Filing
4
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO DISMISS 1 THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO DENY AS MOOT 3 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 12/29/2009. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notification s were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. A Copy of the Findings and Recommendation with the proposed order of adoption, has been served on December 29, 2009 upon the chambers of Judge David Alan Ezra via the orders e-mail address: ezra_orders@hid.uscourts.gov.
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?