Arthur v. Auelua et al
Plaintiff: |
James Arthur, Sr. |
Defendant: |
Faatalale Auelua, Robert E. Jesinger, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3, John and Mary Does 1-10 and Doe Corporations, Partnerships or Other Entities 1-10 |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv00590 |
Filed: |
December 14, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
DAVID ALAN EZRA |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E KOBAYASHI |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 21, 2010 |
Filing
24
ORDER: (1) GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 4 ; (2) STRIKING PLAINTIFF'S UNAUTHORIZED SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS 20 ; AND (3) DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS. ~ the Court declines to exert supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims, and hereby DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all state claim brought against Defendant Faatalale Auelua. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to enter judgment in favor of Robert E. Jesinger and Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3. ~ Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 4/21/2010. [Order follows hearing on Motion 4 held 4/19/2010; Minutes-docket entry no. 23 ] (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry Modified on 4/21/2010 (afc, ).
|
April 5, 2010 |
Filing
22
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION 17 . Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 4/5/2010. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
March 12, 2010 |
Filing
17
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY 6 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND AND FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 3/12/2010. [Order follows hearing on Motion 6 held 3/09/2010; Minutes-docket entry no. 15 ] (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. F&R and Proposed Order to Chambers of Judge David Alan Ezra via orders e-mail address: ezra_orders@hid.uscourts.gov.
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?