Brenner v. Indymac Bank, F.S.B. et al
Plaintiff: |
Steven L. Brenner |
Defendant: |
Indymac Bank, F.S.B., One West Bank, FSB, John or Jane Does 1-100 and John Roes 1-100 |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00113 |
Filed: |
March 2, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Hawaii |
Presiding Judge: |
BARRY M. KURREN |
Presiding Judge: |
SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1601 Truth in Lending |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 26, 2011 |
Filing
75
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S "MOTION/PETITION TO REVERSE OR WITHDRAW ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT" (ECF NO. 74 ) - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/26/11. (All pending motions are denied as moot. Terminating: 73 MOTION/PETITION for Leave to File Amended Complaint.) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Steven L. Brenner shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on January 27, 2011.
|
January 13, 2011 |
Filing
71
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S TO STAY (ECF NO. 70 ) & ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/13/11. ("The court dismisses this action, and the Clerk of Court is directed to close the file.") (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Steven L. Brenner shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on January 14, 2011. Modified on 1/13/2011 (emt, ).
|
December 17, 2010 |
Filing
67
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS RECONSIDERATION MOTION OF COURTS ORDERGRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF No. 50) 61 50 . Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 12/17/2010. ~ Brenner remains allowed to file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint by the extended deadline of December 28, 2010. Brenner states that the court is "unduly burdening" him "with [the] requirement to amend complaint... and such demands... amounts to another point of involunt ary servitude." Motion for Reconsideration 3, ECF No. 61. Brenner misunderstands the courts previous order. The court gave Brenner the option to file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint and stated that "Brenner is free to refrai n from filing such a motion." Order Den. Summ. J. 20, ECF No. 50. Unless by December 28, 2010, Brenner files a motion for leave to file an amended complaint, judgment will be automatically entered against him. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants (Steven Brenner) not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
|
November 30, 2010 |
Filing
60
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S RECONSIDERATION MOTION 54 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 11/30/10. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Steven L. Brenner shall be served by first class mail on December 1, 2010.
|
November 9, 2010 |
Filing
50
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 31 , 42 - - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 11/9/10. ("...because Brenner is proceeding pro se in this action, this court delays entry of judgment. Unless by De cember 8, 2010, Brenner files a motion to file an amended complaint, judgment will be automatically entered." "Any such motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge.") (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. A copy of this order has been served by First Class Mail to Steven L. Brenner at the address of record on November 9, 2010.
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?