Lichtenberg v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Andrew L. Lichtenberg
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2010cv00353
Filed: June 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 31 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/27/11. (The Bivens claim against Giron for allegedly failing to provide proper medication shall proceed. The Bivens claims against Giron for allegedly failing to diagnose Lichtenberg's cancer is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) and § 1915A(b). Because amendment is futile, that claim is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Bivens claims against Rathman and McGrew for allegedly failing to supervise Giron and for keeping Lichtenberg in unhealthy prison conditions that allegedly caused his cancer, are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) and § 1915A (b). Because amendment is futile, those claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. The FTCA claim against the United States shall proceed. Insofar as the FTCA claim is alleged against Giron, Rathman, and McGrew, individually, it is DISMISSED with prejudice . The Bivens claim against the United States Marshal is DISMISSED without prejudice to refiling in a separate complaint and action. The Amended Complaint shall be deemed served upon Defendant United States upon the date of the filing of thi s order. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff and on the United States Marshals Service, at 300 Ala Moana Blvd., Room C-109, Honolulu, HI 96850-0229. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff one 1 summons, one 1 USM- 285 form, one 1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service for Summons forms (AO 398), one 1 Waiver of Service of Summons forms (AO 399), with their instruction sheets, and a copy of the endorsed Amended Complaint.) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE As a registered participant of CM/ECF, Harry Yee, AUSA received this order electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Andrew L. Lichtenberg shall be served by First Class Mail at the address of record on January 28, 2011. A copy of this order shall be forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service electronically and through interoffice delivery.
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS 9 . ~ Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by January 5, 2011 ~ Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 12/15/2010. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SE RVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RECUSE 7 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/13/10. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this documen t electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. A copy of this order has been served by First Class Mail to Andrew L. Lichtenberg at the address of record on July 13, 2010.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lichtenberg v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew L. Lichtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?