Thourot v. Tanuvasa et al
Plaintiff: Richard A. Thourot
Defendant: Eric Tanuvasa, Louis M. Kealoha, John Does 1-10, City and County of Honolulu and Erick A. Tanuvasa
Case Number: 1:2011cv00032
Filed: January 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2012 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Erick A. Tanuvasa re #87 Satisfaction of Judgment (Fukui, Tracy)
August 1, 2012 Filing 87 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of Richard A. Thourot Against City and County of Honolulu by City and County of Honolulu, Eric Tanuvasa. (Fukui, Tracy)
July 25, 2012 Filing 86 CLERK'S JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE ~ Judgment in the amount of $18,000.00 is entered in favor of Plaintiff Richard A. Thourot. re: #85 . (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All participants are registered to receive electronic notifications.
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD #80 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 7/18/2012. ~ ~ "IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff RICHARD A. THOUROT's motion for order confirming the Final Award of Arbitrator, issued on June 25, 2012, shall be and hereby is granted and judgment thereupon in the amount of $18,000.00 shall be entered in favor of Plaintiff, RICHARD A. THOUROT." ~ (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 6, 2012 Filing 84 EO: The Court is in receipt of the proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award ("Proposed Order") submitted by Plaintiff on July 6, 2012. Any objections to the Proposed Order or alternate proposal shall be submitted no later than July 12, 2012. The Court thereafter shall enter its Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and an order entering final judgment. Re #80 MOTION Confirm Arbitration Award. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 5, 2012 Filing 83 EO: Plaintiffs Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award was filed on June 27, 2012 and scheduled for hearing on October 1, 2012. A memorandum of no opposition was filed by Defendant on July 3, 2012. Since the motion is unopposed, the hearing is hereby vacated and the Motion is Granted and terminated.Plaintiff's counsel to submit an Order for the Court's review. Granting #80 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 3, 2012 Filing 82 STATEMENT of No Opposition re #80 MOTION Confirm Arbitration Award filed by City and County of Honolulu. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fukui, Tracy)
June 27, 2012 Filing 81 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #80 MOTION Confirm Arbitration Award : Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2012 at 09:45 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
June 27, 2012 Filing 80 MOTION Confirm Arbitration Award Eric A. Seitz appearing for Plaintiff Richard A. Thourot (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric A. Seitz, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Certificate of Service)(Seitz, Eric)
June 21, 2012 Filing 79 EO: Stipulation to Binding Arbitration filed 6/20/12. Status Conference Re: Arbitration set for 10/18/2012 09:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. The following dates are hereby vacated: 8/21/12, 11:00am, Settlement Conference, Judge Chang; 10/23/12, 9:00am, Final Pretrial Conference, Judge Chang; and 12/4/12, 9:00am, Jury Trial, Judge Kobayashi. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 20, 2012 Filing 78 STIPULATION TO BINDING ARBITRATION. Keith Hunter appointed as Arbitrator. Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on June 20, 2012. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION TO DISMISS with Prejudice All Claims against Erick A. Tanuvasa AND ORDER, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) of the FRCvP. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on June 13, 2012. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION TO AMEND SECOND AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER TO EXTEND EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE DEADLINES; ORDER. Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on June 7, 2012. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SECOND AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 4/19/2012. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All participants are registered to receive electronic notifications.
April 19, 2012 Filing 73 EP: Status Conference Re: suspending discovery and dispositive motions deadline held on 4/19/2012. Counsel informed the Court that mediation is scheduled in June and they have halted all discovery. New trial date given. Second Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 12/4/2012 before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2012 09:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Settlement Conference set for 8/21/2012 11:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Discovery due by 10/5/2012. Motions due by 7/5/2012.( C5 - no record, 9:00-9:05am.) (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )No COS issued for this docket entry
April 16, 2012 Filing 72 EO: At counsel's request, Status Conference Re: suspending discovery and dispositive motions deadline set for 4/19/2012 09:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 13, 2012 Filing 71 ANSWER to #36 Amended Complaint Filed on August 12, 2011 by City and County of Honolulu, Erick A. Tanuvasa. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certficate of Service)(Fukui, Tracy)
March 1, 2012 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard A. Thourot Re: Third Amended Notice of Taking Depositions Upon Oral Examination (Seitz, Eric)
February 27, 2012 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard A. Thourot Re: Second Amended Notice of Taking Depositions Upon Oral Examination (Seitz, Eric)
February 15, 2012 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard A. Thourot Re: Amended Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination (Seitz, Eric)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING DEFENDANTS ERIC TANUVASA AND CITY AND COUNTY OF HONOLULU'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #39 ; AND (2) GRANTING DEFENDANT LOUIS M. KEALOHA'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #46 . ~ Excerpt of Conclusion: "Tanuvasa and the City's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011 is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows: the 1983 claim against the city is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and the state law negligent training, supervision, and/or discipline claim against the City is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Tanuvasa Motion is DENIED in all other respects. Kealoha's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint... is HEREBY GRANTED and the claims against Defendant Kealoha are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is GRANTED until March 15, 2012 to file a Second Amended Complaint, consistent with this Order...." ~ Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 2/13/2012. ~ Order follows hearing held 2/6/2012. Minutes: doc. no. #66 ~ (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 6, 2012 Filing 66 EP: Motion Hearing held on 2/6/2012 re #46 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Louis M. Kealoha, Eric Tanuvasa, City and County of Honolulu, Motions Taken Under Advisement: #46 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), #39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). (Court Reporter Katherine Eismann.) (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 19, 2012 Filing 65 REPLY to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by City and County of Honolulu, Louis M. Kealoha, Erick A. Tanuvasa. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fukui, Tracy)
January 17, 2012 ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number #64 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Richard A. Thourot was filed incorrectly in this case. The Declaration of Della A. Belatti, not the e-filer for this submission was improperly signed with a /s/ (gab, )
January 13, 2012 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #46 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), #39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Richard A. Thourot. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Della A. Belatti, #2 Certificate of Service)(Seitz, Eric)
December 9, 2011 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of Honolulu, Louis M. Kealoha, Erick A. Tanuvasa Regarding City Defendants' Fourth Supplemental Response to Production of Documents (Fukui, Tracy)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on December 5, 2011. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 5, 2011 Filing 61 EO: Pursuant to the Withdarwal filed 12/5/11, Defendants Erick Tanuvasa, Louis M. Kealoha and City and County of Honolulu's Motion to Amend the Rule 16 Scheduling Order #55 set for hearing on 1/30/12 before Judge Chang is hereby vacated. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 5, 2011 Filing 60 EP: Status Conference Re: Trial Date and Other Deadlines held on 12/5/2011. New trial date given. First Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 10/23/2012 before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2012 09:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Settlement Conference set for 6/27/2012 11:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Discovery due by 8/24/2012. Motions due by 5/23/2012. ( C5 - no record, 9:05-9:07am.) (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )No COS issued for this docket entry
December 5, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE by Louis M. Kealoha, City and County of Honolulu, Erick A. Tanuvasa re #55 MOTION to Amend/Correct #29 Scheduling Order, Filed on November 15, 2011 Louis M. Kealoha, City and County of Honolulu, Erick A. Tanuvasa. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fukui, Tracy)
December 2, 2011 Filing 58 EO: At counsel's request, Status Conference Re: Trial Date and Other Deadlines set for 12/5/2011 09:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Della Belatti to notify all parties. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )No COS issued for this docket entry
November 29, 2011 Filing 57 EO: The time for the Final Pretrial Conference set for 9:00am on 3/27/2012 shall be moved to 10:45 AM on 3/27/2012 before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
November 15, 2011 Filing 56 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #55 Defendants Erick Tanuvasa, Louis M. Kealoha and City and County of Honolulu's Motion to Amend the Rule 16 Scheduling Order set for 1/30/2012 09:30 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (sna, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
November 15, 2011 Filing 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct #29 Scheduling Order, Tracy S. Fukui appearing for Defendants City and County of Honolulu, Louis M. Kealoha, Erick A. Tanuvasa (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Fukui, Tracy)
November 14, 2011 Filing 54 MOTION to DISMISS Amend/Correct Amended Complaint #29 Scheduling Order, Tracy S. Fukui appearing for Defendants City and County of Honolulu, Louis M. Kealoha, Erick A. Tanuvasa (Attachments: #1 Supplement in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Fukui, Tracy) Modified on 11/15/2011 - editing motion event selection (bbb, ).
November 10, 2011 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of Honolulu, Louis M. Kealoha, Eric Tanuvasa Regarding 3rd Supplemental Response to Production of Documents (Fukui, Tracy)
November 8, 2011 Filing 51 EO: #39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2011 at 10:30 AM is continued to 2/6/2012 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR NAMING OF EXPERT WITNESSES; ORDER. Signed by Magistrate JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on November 7, 2011. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
November 7, 2011 Filing 49 EP: Status Conference held on 11/7/2011. Discussion held regarding responding to the 11/30/11 Motion to Dismiss and completion of two depositions. Mr. Seitz to contact Judge Kobayashi's courtroom manger to request continuance of the 11/30/11 Motion to Dismiss as both parties are in agreement to a continuance. Counsel to contact this Court as to whether they are able to resolve the discovery issues. ( C5 - no record, 9:00-9:05am.) (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )No COS issued for this docket entry
November 2, 2011 Filing 48 EO: At counsel's request, Status Conference set for 11/7/2011 09:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
November 1, 2011 Filing 47 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #46 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2012 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
November 1, 2011 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) Tracy S. Fukui appearing for Defendants City and County of Honolulu, Louis M. Kealoha, Eric Tanuvasa (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Fukui, Tracy)
October 26, 2011 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard A. Thourot. Louis M. Kealoha served on 9/12/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. (Seitz, Eric)
October 21, 2011 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of Honolulu, Louis M. Kealoha, Erick A. Tanuvasa Regarding City Defendants' 2nd Supplemental Response to Production of Documents (Fukui, Tracy)
October 21, 2011 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of Honolulu, Louis M. Kealoha, Erick A. Tanuvasa Regarding City Defendants' 1st Supplemental Response to Production of Documents (Fukui, Tracy)
October 21, 2011 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of Honolulu, Louis M. Kealoha, Erick A. Tanuvasa Regarding City Defendants' Response to Production of Documents (Fukui, Tracy)
September 28, 2011 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard A. Thourot [Re: Plaintiff's Notice of Taking Depositions Upon Oral Examination] (Seitz, Eric)
September 2, 2011 Filing 40 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2011 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
September 2, 2011 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed August 12, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) Tracy S. Fukui appearing for Defendants City and County of Honolulu, Eric Tanuvasa (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Fukui, Tracy)
August 24, 2011 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard A. Thourot Re: Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendants Erick A. Tanuvasa, Louis M. Kealoha, and City and County of Honolulu (Seitz, Eric)
August 12, 2011 Filing 37 Summons re: #32 First Amended Complaint Issued as to City and County of Honolulu, Louis M. Kealoha, Erick A. Tanuvasa. (afc)
August 12, 2011 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against All Defendants, filed by Richard A. Thourot. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Summons)(Seitz, Eric)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT ERIC TANUVASA'S #21 MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT : "On the basis of the foregoing, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint Filed January 21, 2011 Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 12(b)(6), filed on April 18, 2011, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows: Plaintiff's Fifth Amendment claim and Fourteenth Amendment equal protection claim are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff shall file any Amended Complaint by August 15, 2011. Plaintiff's Ninth Amendment claim and Fourteenth Amendment due process claim are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Motion is DENIED as to the remainder of Plaintiff's claims. IT IS SO ORDERED." Signed by District JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on July 11, 2011. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 27, 2011 Filing 34 EP:Motion Hearing held on 6/27/2011 RE- #21 Defendant Eric Tanuvasas Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed January 21, 2011, Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 12(b)(6) -Oral Discussion Held.The Motion to Dismiss Complaint is hereby taken under advisement.(Court Reporter Katherine Eismann.) (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(lls, )No COS issued for this docket entry
June 13, 2011 Filing 33 REPLY re #32 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Filed June 6, 2011 filed by City and County of Honolulu, Eric Tanuvasa. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fukui, Tracy)
June 6, 2011 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Richard A. Thourot. (Seitz, Eric)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CITY & COUNTY OF HONOLULU'S #7 MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED JANUARY 21, 2011 PURSUANT TO FRCP, RULE 12(b)(6): "On the basis of the foregoing, Defendant City and County of Honolulu's Motion to Dismiss Complaint Filed January 21, 2011 Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 12(b)(6), filed on February 11, 2011, is HEREBY GRANTED. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file his Amended Complaint by August 15, 2011. The Court CAUTIONS Plaintiff that, if he does not file an Amended Complaint by August 15, 2011, the Court will dismiss the claims against the City and County of Honolulu with prejudice.IT IS SO ORDERED." Signed by District JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on May 31, 2011. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 16, 2011 Filing 30 EP: Motion Hearing held on 5/16/2011 re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by City and County of Honolulu. Motion Taken Under Advisement: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). (Court Reporter Katherine Eismann) (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on April 29, 2011. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 29, 2011 Filing 28 REPLY re #24 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Filed on April 19, 2011 filed by City and County of Honolulu, Eric Tanuvasa. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fukui, Tracy)
April 29, 2011 Filing 27 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 4/29/2011. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 5/8/2012 before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2012 09:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Settlement Conference set for 1/25/2012 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Motions due by 12/7/2011. Discovery due by 3/9/2012. (C5 - no record, 9:00-9:05am.) (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )No COS issued for this docket entry
April 26, 2011 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of Honolulu, Eric Tanuvasa re #25 Initial Disclosure (Fukui, Tracy)
April 25, 2011 Filing 25 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by City and County of Honolulu, Eric Tanuvasa. (Fukui, Tracy)
April 20, 2011 ADVISORY ENTRY - incorrect case number (incorrect presiding judge) affixed on entry docket number #23 Certificate of Service filed by Eric Tanuvasa, City and County of Honolulu. Filing party is advised to affix correct case number CV 11-00032 LEK-KSC on future filings. (ecs, )
April 19, 2011 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Richard A. Thourot. (Seitz, Eric)
April 19, 2011 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of Honolulu, Eric Tanuvasa re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Filed January 21, 2011) (Fukui, Tracy)
April 18, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2011 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
April 18, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Tracy S. Fukui appearing for Defendant Eric Tanuvasa (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Fukui, Tracy)
April 11, 2011 Filing 20 EO: At counsel's request, Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set 4/14/11 shall be continued to 09:00AM on 4/29/2011 before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Larry Kawasaki has notified all parties. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )No COS issued for this docket entry
April 7, 2011 Filing 19 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Seitz, Eric)
April 4, 2011 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement (Defendant City & County of Honolulu, Honolulu Police Department's). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fukui, Tracy)
March 30, 2011 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard A. Thourot. Eric Tanuvasa served on 3/26/2011, answer due 4/18/2011. (Seitz, Eric)
March 14, 2011 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL as to Defendant City and County of Honolulu: "The following claims remain against the City: a. Negligence (respondeat superior), b. Assault and Battery (respondeat superior), c. Negligent training, supervision and discipline." Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on March 14, 2011. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 9, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2011 at 10:30 AM is moved to 11:15 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
March 7, 2011 Filing 11 EO: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2011 at 10:00 AM is continued to 5/16/2011 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 2, 2011 Filing 10 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set 4/11/11 shall be continued to 09:00AM on 4/14/2011 before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 14, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2011 at 10:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
February 14, 2011 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of Honolulu re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Memorandum in Support of Motion; Certificate of Service (Fukui, Tracy)
February 11, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Tracy S. Fukui appearing for Defendant City and County of Honolulu (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo in Support of Motion)(Fukui, Tracy)
February 11, 2011 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Tracy S. Fukui appearing for Defendant City and County of Honolulu (Fukui, Tracy)
January 31, 2011 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard A. Thourot. City and County of Honolulu served on 1/21/2011, answer due 2/11/2011. (Seitz, Eric)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI for all further proceedings. JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY no longer assigned to case Please reflect new case number CIVIL NO 11-00032 LEK-KSC on all further pleadings ). Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/28/2011. (gab, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 14, 2011 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 254157 re #1 Complaint. (emt, )
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 4/11/2011 before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/14/11. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements)(emt, )
January 14, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Eric Tanuvasa, City and County of Honolulu, John Does 1-10 - filed by Richard A. Thourot. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Summons issued, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thourot v. Tanuvasa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Tanuvasa
Represented By: Tracy S. Fukui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis M. Kealoha
Represented By: Tracy S. Fukui
Represented By: Matthew S.K. Pyun, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Tracy S. Fukui
Represented By: Matthew S.K. Pyun, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erick A. Tanuvasa
Represented By: Tracy S. Fukui
Represented By: Matthew S.K. Pyun, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Thourot
Represented By: Ronald N.W. Kim
Represented By: Lawrence I. Kawasaki
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Della A. Belatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?