Dagupion v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marc Dagupion
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC, National City Mortgage Co., John Does 1-10, Jane Roes 1-10 and Doe Corporations, Partnerships or Other Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2011cv00120
Filed: February 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Maui
Presiding Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION'S MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS 44 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 12/7/11. ("By December 29, 2011, PNC must document its fees and costs or submit the reque sted declaration.") (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC 37 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 9/14/11. ("Dagupion may file a motion seeking leave to file an attached Second Amended Co mplaint no later than September 29, 2011.") (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT 12 ; 16 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 6/23/11. (Dagupion has until July 14, 2011 to file an Amended Complaint.) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEPartici pants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dagupion v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Dagupion
Represented By: Robin R. Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Brandi J. Buehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Mortgage Co.
Represented By: Lauren Mei-Siang Akitake
Represented By: David B. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roes 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations, Partnerships or Other Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?