Just Tacos, Inc. et al v. Zezulak et al
Plaintiff: |
Just Tacos, Inc. and Resol Hawaii, LLC |
Defendant: |
Michael Zezulak, Just Tacos Pearl City, Inc. and Just Tacos Hawaii Kai, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00663 |
Filed: |
October 28, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
DAVID ALAN EZRA |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 44 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 12, 2013 |
Filing
119
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MICHAEL ZEZULAK, JUST TACOS PEARL CITY, INC., AND JUST TACOS HAWAII KAI, NC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION re 96 , 117 - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/12/13. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
December 9, 2011 |
Filing
29
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 2 . Excerpt of Order: ~ The parties are directed to meet with Magistrate Judge Kevin S.C. Chang withi n thirty (30) days from the date of this Order in an effort to reach some mutually agreeable resolution to the instant action. All discovery in this case is stayed until further Order of this Court. ~ Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 12/9/2011. [Order follows hearing held 12/8/2011. Minutes of hearing: doc no. 28 ] (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?