Kaeo-Tomaselli v. Women's Community Correctional Center et al
Plaintiff: |
Dione Kaeo-Tomaselli |
Defendant: |
Women's Community Correctional Center, Abby Medrano, Department of Public Safety, State of Hawaii, Tina Doe, Eric Doe and Health Care Unit |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00669 |
Filed: |
November 1, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY |
Presiding Judge: |
RICHARD L. PUGLISI |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 19, 2013 |
Filing
58
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 47 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 3/19/13. "Defendants Tina Agaran and Abby Medrano's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Defendant Eric Stevenson is DISM ISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to enter judgment and close the file." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Dion'e Kaeo-Tomaselli served by first class mail at the address of record on March 19, 2013.
|
August 28, 2012 |
Filing
42
ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF re 38 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 8/28/12. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Dion'e Kaeo-Tomaselli were served by first class mail at the address of record on August 28, 2012.
|
May 7, 2012 |
Filing
22
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT ABBY MEDRANO IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AND GIVING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 18 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/7/12. -- " The court gives Kaeo-Tomaselli leave to file a Second Amended Complaint no later than June 12, 2013. The court stresses that claims for money damages against state employees sued only in their official capacities may not be reasserted." " T he Clerk of Court is directed to send Kaeo-Tomaselli two more copies of the "Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint" form for her use." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). A copy of this order, along with two copies of the court's "Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint" form and instructions were served to Dion'e Kaeo-Tomaselli at the address of record on May 7, 2012.
|
November 8, 2011 |
Filing
6
ORDER Dismissing Complaint With Leave To Amend re 1 . Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 11/7/11. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document el ectronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. 3 copies of Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint w/instructions was served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry to the plaintiff.
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?