Courter v. Karolle et al
Plaintiff: Jon Courter
Defendant: S/V Tradition and Jeffrey Karolle
Case Number: 1:2011cv00736
Filed: December 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re: 88 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/4/2013. ~ Order adopts the "Findings and Recommendation Regarding Attorneys' Fees" ~ (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All participants are registered to receive electronic notifications.
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER ENTERED ON JUNE 2, 2013, AND ORDER GRANTING COURTER'S MOTION IN LIMINE RE DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY DEFENDANT AFTER DISCOVERY CUTOFF DAT ED MARCH 19, 2013 re: 80 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 8/19/2013. ~ Related documents: Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order: Doc no. 72 . Motion in Limine re: Documents Produced by Defendant after Discovery Cutoff: Doc no. 31 ; Minutes of hearing on said Motion and other matters: Doc no. 56 ~ (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 6/6/2013. ~ Judgment shall enter in favor of Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Jon Courter as follows: "(1) The Court finds in favor of Courter on his Ve rified Complaint for Declaratory Action and finds that Courter is the sole lawful owner of TRADITION, O.N. 227332; (2) The Court finds in favor of Courter against Karolle on all counts in the Verified Counterclaim; (3) The Court finds against Karolle on his Cross-Claim against TRADITION, O.N. 227332, in rem; and (4) The Court awards Courter reasonable attorney's fees not to exceed twenty-five percent of the amount sued for, pursuant to Haw. Rev. Stat. § 607-14. Courter shall submit a declaration regarding attorneys' fees by June 26, 2013. Karolle will submit any objections challenging only the amount sought by July 12, 2013. The matter will thereafter be referred to the magistrate judge for a determination of the amount of the award." (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All participants are registered to receive electronic notifications.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Courter v. Karolle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S/V Tradition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Karolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Courter
Represented By: Bryan Y.Y. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?