Tierney v. Torikawa et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael C. Tierney |
Defendant: |
Scott Harrington, Matt Pattioa, Lois Torikawa and Irene Revilla |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00056 |
Filed: |
January 25, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI |
Presiding Judge: |
RICHARD L. PUGLISI |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1343 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 15, 2013 |
Filing
88
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO EXHAUST re 58 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 3/15/13. "1. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Plaintiff's failure to exhaust pr ison administrative remedies is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint and action are DISMISSED without prejudice. 2. The Clerk of Court SHALL enter judgment and close this case. 3. The court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) and Fede ral Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that an appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Michael C. Tierney served by first class mail at the address of record on March 15, 2013.
|
January 23, 2013 |
Filing
68
ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR PRESENCE AT HEARING AND FOR DISCOVERY re: 65 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 1/22/2013. (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notificat ions received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
January 18, 2013 |
Filing
67
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S ORDER DENYING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 1/18/2013. [Plaintiff's Objections: doc. no. 60 . Order Denying Appointment of Counsel: doc . no. 57 ] (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
August 7, 2012 |
Filing
44
ORDER DENYING 42 MOTION UNDER RULE 60(b). Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on August 7, 2012. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
August 3, 2012 |
Filing
43
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR MANDATORY DISQUALIFICATION OR RECUSAL OF UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE re 41 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 8/2/12. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Michael C. Tierney served by first class mail at the address of record on August 3, 2012.
|
July 24, 2012 |
Filing
38
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 36 AND FOR HEARING 37 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 7/24/2012. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
June 19, 2012 |
Filing
34
ORDER DENYING MICHAEL C. TIERNEY'S 29 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on June 19, 2012. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notif ications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
January 30, 2012 |
Filing
7
ORDER DENYING 4 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by District JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on January 30, 2012. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?