March v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Debra L. March |
Defendant: |
Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Chase Home Finance |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00306 |
Filed: |
May 29, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Kauai |
Presiding Judge: |
BARRY M. KURREN |
Presiding Judge: |
SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1640 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 10, 2015 |
Filing
157
ORDER APPROVING COMMISSIONER'S FINAL REPORT AND DISCHARGING COMMISSIONER 152 .. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/10/2015. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notif ications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
May 6, 2015 |
Filing
145
ORDER ADOPTING 142 MAGISTRATE JUDGES MARCH 31, 2015 FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT DEFENDANT U.S. BANK'S MOTION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE, FOR APPROVAL OF COMMISSIONERS REPORT, AND FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION BE GRANTED. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 5/6/2015. ~ the Court OVERRULES Marchs objections, andADOPTS the March 31, 2015 Findings of Fact and Recommendation that U.S.Banks Motion for Confirmation of Sale, for Approval of Commissioners Report,and for Writ of Possession be granted, as the opinion and order of this Court. TheMotion for Confirmation of Sale, for Approval of Commissioners Report, and forWrit of Possession (Dkt. No. 133 ) is GRANTED as stated in the March 31, 2015Findings of Fact and Re commendation. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
September 26, 2014 |
Filing
112
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 89 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/26/2014. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received t his document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants (Debra L. March) not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
March 27, 2014 |
Filing
77
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE CLAIM OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT STATE OF HAWAI'I 71 . Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/27/2014. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to r eceive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?