Gibo v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: |
Evelyn Jane Gibo |
Defendant: |
U.S. Bank National Association, David B. Rosen, The Law Office Of, David B. Rosen and Doe Defendants 1-50 |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00514 |
Filed: |
September 12, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY |
Presiding Judge: |
RICHARD L. PUGLISI |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 8, 2021 |
Filing
336
ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT BANKS re 260 . Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/8/2021.The motions for summary judgment (Lima, ECF No. 238; Gibo, ECF No. 260; Bald, ECF No. 170) are reinstated and granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Defendant Banks and to close these cases. (cib)
|
October 30, 2013 |
Filing
144
ORDER MODIFYING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION THAT MOTIONS FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS BE DENIED re 125 , 126 , 137 , 138 , 139 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/30/13. "The port ions of the F & R objected to have been reviewed and modified. The court here adopts the Magistrate Judge's recommendation that the Rosen Defendants' motions for Rule 11 sanctions be denied." (emt, )CERT IFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
May 6, 2013 |
Filing
94
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS re 22 , 38 , 91 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/30/13. "The court grants the motions. This disposes of all claims in the Gibo and Lima cases. However, given Plaintiffs' references to possible Second Amended Complaints, the court will not enter judgment immediately. If Plaintiffs wish to file a Second Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs must seek leave by filing a moti on directed to the Magistrate Judge on or before May 21, 2013. Any such motion shall include as an attachment a copy of the proposed Second Amended Complaint. This court expresses no opinion as to whether any such motion should or should not be gr anted. If Plaintiffs fail to seek leave on or before May 21, 2013, the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for the Banks and Rosen and close these cases on May 22, 2013. " (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
April 30, 2013 |
Filing
91
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS re 22 , 38 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/30/13. " The court grants the motions. This disposes of all claims in the Gibo and Lima cases. H owever, given Plaintiffs' references to possible Second Amended Complaints, the court will not enter judgment immediately. If Plaintiffs wish to file a Second Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs must seek leave by filing a motion directed to the Ma gistrate Judge on or before May 21, 2013. Any such motion shall include as an attachment a copy of the proposed Second Amended Complaint. This court expresses no opinion as to whether any such motion should or should not be granted. If Plaintiff s fail to seek leave on or before May 21, 2013, the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for the Banks and Rosen and close these cases on May 22, 2013. " (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants regis tered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
March 29, 2013 |
Filing
84
ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER OF REMAND for 73 , 74 . Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 03/29/2013. (eps) -- The court adopts the F&Rs e xcept with regard to the "similar class actions" issue and the "fraudulent joinder" issue. The F&Rs may well be correct with respect to those issues, but they are unnecessary to the present ruling. Plaintiffs' motions to rema nd are denied on the other bases set forth in the F&Rs. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in both the Lima (CIV NO 12-00509 SOM-RLP) and Gibo (CIV 12-00514 SOM-RLP) cases CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE< /center>Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?